EP2423698 - SQUID MAGNETIC SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Toyohashi University of Technology 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATSUKADE, Yoshimi c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1, Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Saburo c/o Natinoal University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | 03 /
KANAI, Sho c/o National University Corporation TOYOHASHI UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY 1-1 Hibarigaoka Tempaku-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 441-8580 / JP | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10766796.6 | 13.04.2010 | WO2010JP02665 | Priority number, date | JP20090105709 | 23.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009105709 | [2012/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122733 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2423698 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/035, H01L39/22 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
G01R33/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | SQUID-MAGNETSENSOR | [2012/09] | English: | SQUID MAGNETIC SENSOR | [2012/09] | French: | CAPTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE À INTERFÉROMÈTRE QUANTIQUE SUPRACONDUCTEUR (SQUID) | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | Translation filed | 12.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0378675 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH0792247 (CHODENDO SENSOR KENKYUSHO KK); | [A]JPH08316538 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH0983026 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPH1048303 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2001091611 (HITACHI LTD, et al) |