EP2422045 - PROCESSES AND SYSTEMS FOR TREATING OIL AND GAS WELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Production Sciences, Inc. 1442 Lake Front Circle Suite 100 The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Completion Technology Ltd. 2202 Timberloch Place Suite 116 The Woodlands, Texas 77380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASAKI, Mark Hiroshi 13018 Bramford Point Lane Houston Texas 77070 / US | 02 /
RUBBO, Richard Paul 10 Maple Loft Place The Woodlands Texas 77381 / US | 03 /
ARIZMENDI, Jr., Napoleon 11910 Presley Drive Magnolia Texas 77355 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Selby, David Sean, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/09] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10767904.5 | 26.04.2010 | WO2010US32467 | Priority number, date | US20090172292P | 24.04.2009 Original published format: US 172292 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010124303 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2422045 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/12, E21B34/10, E21B43/16 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
E21B43/123 (EP,US);
E21B34/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ÖL- UND GASBOHRUNGEN | [2012/09] | English: | PROCESSES AND SYSTEMS FOR TREATING OIL AND GAS WELLS | [2012/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE PUITS DE PÉTROLE ET DE GAZ | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 19.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2012 | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5806598 (AMANI MOHAMMAD [US]); | [A]US6691787 (AMANI MOHAMMAD [US]); | [A]US2007235197 (BECKER BILLY G [US], et al); | [A]US7445049 (HOWARD WILLIAM F [US], et al) |