EP2496928 - Method for determining polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbon contaminant concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/37] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING POLYCYCLIC AROMATIC HYDROCARBON CONTAMINANT CONCENTRATION | ||
[2018/29] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität für Bodenkultur Wien Gregor Mendel Straße 33 1180 WIEN / AT | For all designated states Janik, Leslie Joseph 71 Oakley Road McLaren Flat, South Australia South Australia 5171 / AU | [2018/35] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Universität für Bodenkultur Wien Gregor Mendel-Strasse 33 1180 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Janik, Leslie Joseph 71 Oakley Road McLaren Flat SA 5171 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANIK, Leslie Joseph 71 Oakley Road McLaren Flat, South Australia South Australia 5171 / AU | 02 /
LOIBNER, Andreas Paul Pater Effenberger Str. 19B A-3012 Wolfsgraben / AT | 03 /
KATTNER, Juergen Hannoverg. 17/16 A-1200 Wien / AT | 04 /
EDELMANN, Eva Feldg. 8/1/19 A-2000 Stockerau / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | 01 /
JANIK, Leslie Joseph 71 Oakley Road McLaren Flat South Australia South Australia 5171 / AU | ||
02 /
LOIBNER, Andreas Paul Pater Effenberger Str. 19B A-3012 Wolfsgraben / AT | |||
03 /
KATTNER, Juergen Hannoverg. 17/16 A-1200 Wien / AT | |||
04 /
EDELMANN, Eva Feldg. 8/1/19 A-2000 Stockerau / AT | Representative(s) | Redl, Gerda, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Straße 11 1220 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Redl, Gerda, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Tech Gate Vienna Donau-City-Straße 1 1220 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 10768238.7 | 21.10.2010 | WO2010EP65911 | Priority number, date | EP20090174729 | 02.11.2009 Original published format: EP 09174729 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051166 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2496928 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/93, G01N21/27, G01N21/31, G01N21/3563, // G01N21/359 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01N21/274 (EP,US);
G01N21/314 (EP,US);
G01N21/93 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3133 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3155 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3595 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (US);
G01N21/3577 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | G01N21/35, G01N21/93, G01N21/27, G01N21/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Konzentration von Kontaminanten in Form von polycyclischen aromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | [2018/29] | English: | Method for determining polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbon contaminant concentration | [2018/29] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la concentration en contaminants hydrocarbures aromatiques polycycliques | [2018/29] |
Former [2012/37] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KONZENTRATION VON KONTAMINANTEN IN FORM VON POLYCYCLISCHEN AROMATISCHEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | ||
Former [2012/37] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING POLYCYCLIC AROMATIC HYDROCARBON CONTAMINANT CONCENTRATION | ||
Former [2012/37] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE CONCENTRATION DE CONTAMINANT HYDROCARBONÉ AROMATIQUE POLYCYCLIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD] - MADARI B E ET AL, "Mid- and near-infrared spectroscopic assessment of soil compositional parameters and structural indices in two Ferralsols", GEODERMA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.GEODERMA.2006.03.026, vol. 136, no. 1-2, ISSN 0016-7061, (20061201), pages 245 - 259, (20061201), XP025238053 [AD] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [02.8] * * paragraph [03.2]; table 3 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.geoderma.2006.03.026 | [AD] - BRAY J G P ET AL, "Diagnostic screening of urban soil contaminants using diffuse reflectance spectroscopy", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF SOIL RESEARCH, MELBOURNE LNKD- DOI:10.1071/SR08068, (20090630), vol. 47, no. 4, ISSN 0004-9573, pages 433 - 442, XP008120983 [AD] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/SR08068 | [A] - ZIMMERMANN ET AL, "Quantifying soil organic carbon fractions by infrared-spectroscopy", SOIL BIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.SOILBIO.2006.07.010, (20061116), vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0038-0717, pages 224 - 231, XP005770678 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.soilbio.2006.07.010 | [A] - VISCARRA ROSSEL R A ET AL, "Visible, near infrared, mid infrared or combined diffuse reflectance spectroscopy for simultaneous assessment of various soil properties", GEODERMA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.GEODERMA.2005.03.007, vol. 131, no. 1-2, ISSN 0016-7061, (20060301), pages 59 - 75, (20060301), XP025238263 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.geoderma.2005.03.007 | Examination | WO2011035391 | by applicant | - JANIK ET AL., AUST. J. EXP. AGRIC., (1998), vol. 38, pages 681 - 696 | - REEVES ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEAR INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY, (1999), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 179 - 193 | - COZZOLINO; MORON, JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 140, pages 65 - 71 | - FERRALSOLS, J GEODERMA, (2006), vol. 136, no. 1-2, pages 245 - 259 | - BRAY ET AL., AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF SOIL RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 47, pages 433 - 442 | - GELADI; KOWALSKI, ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1986), vol. 185, pages 1 - 17 |