EP2486739 - MAPPING COMMERCIAL MOBILE ALERT SERVICE MESSAGES TO CELL BROADCASTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Mobility II LLC 1025 Lenox Park Blvd. NE Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALY, Brian, K. 1840 E. Hamlin Street Seattle WA 98112 / US | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [2012/33] | Trichard, Louis Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South GB-Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10768326.0 | 30.09.2010 | WO2010US50811 | Priority number, date | US20090574951 | 07.10.2009 Original published format: US 574951 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011043975 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2486739 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H04L12/1895 (EP,US);
H04W76/40 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | ZUORDNUNG VON KOMMERZIELLEN ALARMDIENST-MOBILNACHRICHTEN ZU ZELLRUNDFUNKOPERATIONEN | [2012/33] | English: | MAPPING COMMERCIAL MOBILE ALERT SERVICE MESSAGES TO CELL BROADCASTS | [2012/33] | French: | APPLICATION À DES DIFFUSIONS CELLULAIRES DE MESSAGES COMMERCIAUX PAR SERVICE D'ALERTE SUR MOBILES | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Technical realization of Cell Broadcast Service (CBS) (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.041, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090901), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 44, XP050362190 [X] 1-20 * chapters 2, 3, 5, 8, 9.1, 9.2.2, 9.3.1, 9.3.19, 9.4.1.2-9.4.1.2.2, 9.4.1.3.2.9.4.1.3.4, 9.4.2.2-9.4.2.2.5 * | [Y] - ATIS TIA, "JOINT ATIS/TIA CMAS MOBILE DEVICE BEHAVIOR SPECIFICATION", Online, vol. TIA J-STD-100, (20090101), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://specs4.ihserc.com/DocViewFrame.aspx?sess=557693715&prod=SPECS4&docid=FNNQLCAAAAAAAAAA, (20101130), XP002612045 [Y] 8-13 * chapters 5.1, 10.1, A.1 * | [Y] - "Liaison Statement to ITU-T Study Group2", 3GPP DRAFT; GP-090041, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090205), vol. TSG GERAN, no. Malta; 20090216, XP050414332 [Y] 8-13 * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 2, paragraph 1 * | [X] - DALY B K, SENNET D, MUSGROVE P, "Commercial Mobile Alert Service (CMAS) Section 8.1, 8.2 & 8.3 of the CMAS VIA GSM/UMTS CELL BROADCAST SERVICE SPECIFICATION", 3GPP2-DRAFTS, 2500 WILSON BOULEVARD, SUITE 300, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA 22201, USA, (200803), pages 1 - 10, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp2.org/TSGC/Working/2008/2008-03-Montreal/TR45.5-2008-04-Montreal/CMAS/500-CMAS-08040206_CMAS%20WTSC-G3GSN%20E-Interface.zip, (20101130), XP040479625 [X] 1-6,14-20 * chapters 8.1, 8.2 * | [A] - DALY B K, SENNET D, MUSGROVE P, "Commercial Mobile Alert Service (CMAS) Functional Architecture and Interfaces for GSM/UMTS", 3GPP2-DRAFTS, 2500 WILSON BOULEVARD, SUITE 300, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA 22201, USA, (200803), pages 1 - 3, URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp2.org/TSGC/Working/2008/2008-03-Montreal/TR45.5-2008-04-Montreal/CMAS/500-CMAS-08040206_CMAS%20WTSC-G3GSN%20E-Interface.zip, (20101130), XP040487550 [A] 1-20 * chapter 7 * |