EP2482687 - GARMENT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brundan, Andrew Russell House Wilby IP21 5LX, Suffolk / GB | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn GB-London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10769037.2 | 28.09.2010 | WO2010GB01816 | Priority number, date | GB20090017171 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: GB 0917171 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011039504 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2482687 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/03 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A45C13/03 (EP,US);
B65D85/182 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | KLEIDERTRÄGER | [2012/32] | English: | GARMENT CARRIER | [2012/32] | French: | PORTE-VÊTEMENT | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 10.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/21] | 13.04.2015 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US1800429 (BECHERER FLOYD O); | [A]GB384712 (ELMER ELLSWORTH WILT); | [XYI]US1951985 (LIKLY JAMES W); | [XYI]US2597904 (SIMONSEN PETER H); | [Y]AU490299B ; | [YA]US4669642 (NICHOLAS ROBERT J L [US]); | [XYI]GB2326864 (WANG JENQ PYNG [TW]); | [Y]JP2006306466 (AAKI KK) |