EP2425471 - SINGLE CELL AND BATTERY PACK COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen 518118 / CN | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Weixin No. 3001 Hengping Road Pingshan Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2012/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10769251.9 | 18.04.2010 | WO2010CN71862 | Priority number, date | CN20091107175 | 30.04.2009 Original published format: CN200910107175 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010124562 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2425471 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2425471 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M2/26, H01M10/04, H01M2/02 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
H01M10/0413 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/531 (KR);
H01M50/103 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/509 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/514 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | H01M2/00, H01M2/02, H01M2/08 | ||
Former IPC [2012/10] | H01M2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINZELZELLE UND BATTERIEPACK DAMIT | [2012/10] | English: | SINGLE CELL AND BATTERY PACK COMPRISING THE SAME | [2012/10] | French: | CELLULE UNIQUE ET BATTERIE D'ALIMENTATION COMPRENANT CETTE DERNIÈRE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 20.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2010 | AT | 15.04.2015 | BE | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | IT | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | MK | 15.04.2015 | MT | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | SM | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | IE | 18.04.2015 | LU | 18.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | NO | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 18.04.2010 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
SM | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.04.2010 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
SM | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1475852 (ENAX INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figures 2-6 *; | [XY]US2006115727 (KIM YONG-SAM [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018]; figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0078] *[Y] 5-7; | [XY]WO2008144994 (BYD CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 18; figures 2-6; claims 1-8 * [Y] 5-7 | International search | [A]EP1160893 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US2005238953 (URSO TINA [US], et al); | [X]CN1697240 (ZHONG XINJIA [CN]); | [A]CN1697240 (ZHONG XINJIA [CN]); | [XP]CN201349038Y (BYD CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]CN101662004 (BYD CO LTD) |