EP2426418 - COOKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMURO, Yoneo Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10769735.1 | 27.04.2010 | WO2010JP57450 | Priority number, date | JP20090109761 | 28.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009109761 | [2012/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010126037 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426418 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/02, F24C15/34 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
F24C15/006 (EP,US);
F24C15/2007 (EP,US);
F24C15/327 (EP,US);
H05B6/642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | KOCHVORRICHTUNG | [2012/10] | English: | COOKING DEVICE | [2012/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2011 | Translation filed | 23.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 12.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2008051360 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09273759 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2005003317 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2008032286 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPS6050319 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008116094 |