EP2426484 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING a GAS SENSOR USING METAL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/10] | GAS SENSOR USING METAL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2017/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amogreentech Co., Ltd. 185-1, Sucham-ri Tongjin-eup Kimpo-si, Kyonggi-do 415-863 / KR | For all designated states KIST Korea Institute of Science and Technology 39-1 Hawolgok-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-791 / KR | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Il-Doo 107-1305 Daelim Apt. 501 Daebang-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-020 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Dong-Young 1-1103 Sin Hyundai Apt. 65 Hoegi-dong Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-792 / KR | 03 /
JANG, Sung-Yeon 103-1202 Boseong Hwangsil Town 2466-1 Namsan 4-dong Jung-gu Daegu 700-751 / KR | 04 /
JO, Seong-Mu 177-14 Seongbuk 1-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-825 / KR | 05 /
HONG, Jae-Min 159-4 Anam-dong 5-ga Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-075 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Yun-Seok 202-106 Cheongsong Apt. 2-danji Gimpo 2-dong Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 415-060 / KR | 07 /
YANG, Sung-Chul 139-401 Hwagok Prugio Apt. 1091 Hwagok-dong Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-010 / KR | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/10] | Collin, Jérôme, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10769981.1 | 30.04.2010 | [2018/12] | WO2010KR02766 | Priority number, date | KR20090038043 | 30.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090038043 | [2012/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010126336 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2426484 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2426484 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/02, B05B5/025, G01N27/12, G01N33/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
B05B5/0255 (EP,US);
G01N27/12 (KR);
C23C24/04 (US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C23C24/00 (US);
C23C24/02 (EP,US);
C23C26/00 (US);
C23C4/10 (KR);
C23C4/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | G01N27/12, B82B3/00, C23C4/10, C23C4/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GASSENSORS MIT METALLOXIDNANOPARTIKELN | [2017/49] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING a GAS SENSOR USING METAL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES | [2017/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CAPTEUR DE GAZ UTILISANT DES NANOPARTICULES D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE | [2017/49] |
Former [2012/10] | GASSENSOR MIT METALLOXIDNANOPARTIKELN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/10] | GAS SENSOR USING METAL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
Former [2012/10] | CAPTEUR DE GAZ UTILISANT DES NANOPARTICULES D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CE CAPTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2011 | Translation filed | 29.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 17.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2010 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | IE | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | LU | 30.04.2018 | MT | 30.04.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MK | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
MT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.04.2010 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
MT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
MT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
MT | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
IE | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0750192 (SUN ELECTRIC UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 5 * column 5, lines 21 - 28; figures 1, 2 ** column 6, lines 17 - 43; figure 4 *; | [XYI]EP1669747 (ETH ZUERICH [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-9,14 * paragraphs [001 ] - [00 4] - [ 10 ] - [0 17] - [ 21 ] - [0 26]; figures 3a - 3d; claim 1 * [Y] 5 [I] 10-12,15; | [XY]US2006249384 (KIM YONG S [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 7] , [ 17 ] - [0 19] - [0 50] , [0 51]; figure 1 * [Y] 5 | International search | [X]KR20070066859 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A]KR20080052249 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20090011631 (M2N INC [KR]); | [A]KR20100044944 (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) | by applicant | KR100583910B | US7259109 | KR100843191B |