EP2424395 - KNITTED GLOVES HAVING A SINGLE LAYER WITH A PLURALITY OF YARNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansell Limited Level 3 678 Victoria Street Richmond, Victoria 3121 / AU | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWEENEY, Sean 101 Adams Way Jackson New Jersey 08527 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Eric 209 Heather Drive Central South Carolina 29630 / US | 03 /
MORELAND, James H. 111 Silver Crest Drive Central South Carolina 29630 / US | 04 /
NELSON, Cherilyn N. 222 Kathmaette Drive Seneca South Carolina 29678 / US | 05 /
YORK, Steven M. 4917 Beechwood Road Avon Indiana 46123 / US | 06 /
PERALES SOLIS, Norberto Hector Bahia Ballenas 1016 Ciudad Juarez Chihuahua 32590 / MX | 07 /
BARMORE, Chris 5 Clock Tower Place Suite 120 Maynard Massachusetts 01754 / US | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10770335.7 | 29.04.2010 | WO2010US32977 | Priority number, date | US20090173811P | 29.04.2009 Original published format: US 173811 P | US20090222552P | 02.07.2009 Original published format: US 222552 P | US20090242487P | 15.09.2009 Original published format: US 242487 P | US20090242929P | 16.09.2009 Original published format: US 242929 P | US20090242936P | 16.09.2009 Original published format: US 242936 P | US20090243372P | 17.09.2009 Original published format: US 243372 P | US20090243376P | 17.09.2009 Original published format: US 243376 P | US20100294923P | 14.01.2010 Original published format: US 294923 P | US20100768953P | 28.04.2010 Original published format: US 768953 P | US20100769829P | 29.04.2010 Original published format: US 769829 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010127123 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424395 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A41D19/00, D04B1/28, D04B1/12 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
D04B1/28 (EP,US);
A41D19/01505 (EP,US);
D04B1/126 (EP,US);
A41D2500/10 (EP,US);
D10B2403/0112 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | A41D19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | STRICKHANDSCHUHE MIT EINER EINZELSCHICHT MIT MEHREREN VERSCHIEDENEN GARNEN | [2012/10] | English: | KNITTED GLOVES HAVING A SINGLE LAYER WITH A PLURALITY OF YARNS | [2012/10] | French: | GANTS TRICOTÉS COMPRENANT UNE SEULE COUCHE AVEC UNE PLURALITÉ DE FILS | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 02.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007022511 (NARASIMHAN DAVE [US], et al); | [Y]US2008295219 (ANDERSEN PETER BEICKER [DK], et al); | [Y]US6505350 (LITKE KENNETH S [US]); | [Y]US5815839 (SAFFORD KENNY [US]); | [Y]US2003186608 (GOLDBERG ARTHUR [US]); | [Y]US6216431 (ANDREWS MARK A [US]); | [Y]US5829061 (VISGIL JANE T [US], et al); | [Y]US2006059604 (LAI HEE M [MY], et al); | [Y]US5500956 (SCHULKIN WILLIAM V [US], et al); | [Y]US5119512 (DUNBAR JAMES J [US], et al) |