EP2493740 - DATA BUS FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISELE, Markus Schwarzer Brunnen 55 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
BREIDENBACH, Patrick Am Fronberg 7 97753 Karlstadt / DE | 03 /
WINKLER, Benjamin Schwabenstraße 64 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10770800.0 | 19.10.2010 | WO2010EP65696 | Priority number, date | DE20091045975 | 26.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009045975 | [2012/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051139 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493740 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493740 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
B60W50/0205 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W20/11 (EP,US);
B60W50/04 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2050/0045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENBUS FÜR EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2012/36] | English: | DATA BUS FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE | [2012/36] | French: | BUS TRANSMETTEUR DE DONNÉES POUR VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/36] | BUS DE DONNÉES POUR UN VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 19.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2010 | AL | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MK | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | SM | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | IE | 19.10.2013 | LU | 19.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | NO | 31.10.2013 | RS | 31.10.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 31.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0941894 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5* the whole document *; | [A]US2007112483 (JEONG KEUM-CHEOL [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [I]KR100841693B (SSANGYONG MOTOR CO [KR]) [I] 1-5,7 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE102007059438 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * |