EP2494289 - ICE MAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGELE, Boris Neuwiese 11 86911 Diessen / DE | 02 /
BECKE, Christoph Kolbermoorer Str. 15A 83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | 03 /
EICHER, Max Laimer platz 1a 80689 München / DE | 04 /
STAUD, Ralph Wörthstr. 30 81667 München / DE | 05 /
TISCHER, Thomas Jagdstraße 9 85540 Haar / DE | [2014/15] |
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
ANGELE, Boris Neuwiese 11 86911 Diessen / DE | ||
02 /
BECKE, Christoph Kolbermoorer Str. 15A 83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | |||
03 /
EICHER, Max Aldegreverstr. 22 80687 München / DE | |||
04 /
STAUD, Ralph Wörthstr. 30 81667 München / DE | |||
05 /
TISCHER, Thomas Jagdstraße 9 85540 Haar / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10770802.6 | 19.10.2010 | WO2010EP65743 | Priority number, date | DE20091046021 | 27.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009046021 | [2012/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011051142 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2494289 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494289 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25C5/06, F25C5/18, F25C1/22, F25D21/04 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
F25C5/06 (EP,US);
F25C1/25 (EP);
F25C5/185 (EP);
F25C2305/0221 (EP,US);
F25C2400/10 (EP);
F25C2400/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EISBEREITER | [2012/36] | English: | ICE MAKER | [2012/36] | French: | MACHINE À GLAÇONS | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2010 | AL | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | RS | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | SM | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | AT | 19.10.2015 | IE | 19.10.2015 | LU | 19.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
AT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
SM | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
AT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/18] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
AT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
RS | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | |
NO | 04.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0926238 (SHARP KK) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [X]WO2008020723 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,12,13,15* page 14, line 26 - page 16, line 12; figure 5 *; | [XY]EP2080968 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,6,7,12,13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 5 | by applicant | DE4113767 |