EP2488798 - SOLAR ENERGY COLLECTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Jeffrey 2897 Olympic View Drive Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10770918.0 | 14.10.2010 | WO2010US52687 | Priority number, date | US20090251568P | 14.10.2009 Original published format: US 251568 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011047164 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488798 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/05, F24J2/30, F24J2/32, F28D15/02 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
F28D15/0266 (EP,US);
F24S10/30 (EP,US);
F24S10/45 (EP,US);
F24S10/95 (EP,US);
F28D15/0275 (EP,US);
Y02E10/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | SONNENENERGIESAMMELSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/34] | English: | SOLAR ENERGY COLLECTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2012/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE D'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 03.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4474170 (MCCONNELL ROBERT D [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 3 - line 10; figures 1,2,8 *; | [Y]US4686961 (GARRISON JOHN D [US]) [Y] 1 * column 16, line 63 - column 17, line 27; figures 11,12 *; | [A]JPS5687742 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009047528 (LAMB LEO [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - line 12; figures 1,3,4,5 *; | [A]US6668555 (MORIARTY MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - line 60; figures 2,5 * | by applicant | US4474170 |