EP2475785 - MICRORNA EXPRESSION SIGNATURE IN PERIPHERAL BLOOD OF PATIENTS AFFECTED BY HEPATOCARCINOMA OR HEPATIC CIRRHOSIS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Istituto Nazionale Di Genetica Molecolare-INGM Via Francesco Sforza 35 20122 Milano / IT | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGANI, Massimiliano Piazza Salvo D'Acquisto 40 I-24069 Trescore Balneario (bergamo) / IT | 02 /
DE FRANCESCO, Raffaele Via Tolstoi 1 I-20146 Milano / IT | 03 /
ABRIGNANI, Sergio Via Rinascente 2 I-53040 Serre Di Rapolano (siena) / IT | 04 /
ROSSETTI, Grazisa Viale Giovanni da Cermenate 1 I-20141 Milano / IT | 05 /
ROSSI, Riccardo Lorenzo Via Canonici 54 I-24040 Stezzano (Bergamo) / IT | [2013/37] |
Former [2012/29] | 01 /
PAGANI, Massimiliano Piazza Salvo D'Acquisto 40 I-24069 Trescore Balneario (bergamo) / IT | ||
02 /
DE FRANCESCO, Raffaele Via Remo La Valle 3 I-20147 Milano / IT | |||
03 /
ABRIGNANI, Sergio Via Rinascente 2 I-53040 Serre Di Rapolano (siena) / IT | |||
04 /
ROSSETTI, Grazisa Viale Giovanni da Cermenate 1 I-20141 Milano / IT | |||
05 /
ROSSI, Riccardo Lorenzo Via Canonici 54 I-24040 Stezzano (Bergamo) / IT | Representative(s) | Capasso, Olga, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Capasso, Olga, et al De Simone & Partners S.p.A. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2012/29] | Biggi, Cristina c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10771185.5 | 06.09.2010 | WO2010IB54001 | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01538 | 07.09.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091538 | [2012/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011027332 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2475785 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | MICRORNA-EXPRESSIONSSIGNATUR IM PERIPHEREN BLUT VON PATIENTEN MIT LEBERKARZINOM ODER LEBERZIRRHOSE SOWIE VERWENDUNG | [2012/29] | English: | MICRORNA EXPRESSION SIGNATURE IN PERIPHERAL BLOOD OF PATIENTS AFFECTED BY HEPATOCARCINOMA OR HEPATIC CIRRHOSIS AND USES THEREOF | [2012/29] | French: | SIGNATURE D'EXPRESSION DE MICROARN DANS LE SANG PÉRIPHÉRIQUE DE PATIENTS AFFECTÉS PAR UN HÉPATOCARCINOME OU UNE CIRRHOSE HÉPATIQUE ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLE-CI | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP13178241.9 / EP2657354 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2008054828 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2008153987 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I] - MURAKAMI Y ET AL, "Comprehensive analysis of microRNA expression patterns in hepatocellular carcinoma and non-tumorous tissues", ONCOGENE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20060401), vol. 25, no. 17, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 2537 - 2545, XP002529509 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.ONC.1209283 | [X] - WONG Q W-L ET AL, "MicroRNA-223 Is Commonly Repressed in Hepatocellular Carcinoma and Potentiates Expression of Stathmin1", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 135, no. 1, ISSN 0016-5085, (20080701), pages 257 - 269, (20080411), XP022823123 [X] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2008.04.003 |