EP2596556 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR INCREASING THE CONCENTRATION OF NEGATIVE IONS IN A CLOSED SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weyergans, Rudolf An Gut Boisdorf 8 52355 Düren / DE | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTMANN, Rudolf Kiefernweg 6 52372 Kreuzau / DE | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Kai Donatusstraße 1 52078 Aachen / DE | [2013/22] | Application number, filing date | 10771378.6 | 08.10.2010 | WO2010EP65099 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045367 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596556 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2596556 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01T23/00, A61N1/44 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
H01T23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER KONZENTRATION VON NEGATIV-IONEN IN EINEM GESCHLOSSENEN RAUM | [2013/22] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR INCREASING THE CONCENTRATION OF NEGATIVE IONS IN A CLOSED SPACE | [2013/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DESTINÉS À AUGMENTER LA CONCENTRATION D'IONS NÉGATIFS DANS UN LOCAL CLOS | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 16.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2010 | AL | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | RS | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | SM | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | GB | 08.10.2015 | IE | 08.10.2015 | LU | 08.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.10.2010 | |
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
IE | 08.10.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.10.2010 | |
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
IE | 08.10.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
IE | 08.10.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RS | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4794486 (BLACH THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 10; figure - * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 1 - line 15 *; | [Y]US4686370 (BLACH THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 55 * * column 3, line 1 - line 10 * * column 4, line 10 - line 60 * * column 5, line 30 - column 2, line 2 *; | [A]US4107756 (BEST ROBERT H, et al) [A] 4 * column 5, line 20 - line 30 *; | [A]FR2888054 (GENIE ET ENVIRONNEMENT SARL [FR]) [A] 6 * page 5, line 14 - line 20 *; | [A]DE4244811 (BORKOWSKI HENRYK [DE], et al) [A] 7 * column 2, line 20 - line 45; figure . * | Examination | US4812711 | by applicant | DE2809054 |