EP2499718 - ROTOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖNIG, Werner Kleiststrasse 5 71083 Herrenberg / DE | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/38] | Application number, filing date | 10771660.7 | 19.10.2010 | WO2010EP06386 | Priority number, date | DE20091052596 | 10.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009052596 | [2012/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057703 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2499718 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K15/03 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
H02K1/274 (EP,US);
H02K15/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | ROTOR EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2012/38] | English: | ROTOR OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2012/38] | French: | ROTOR DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 26.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JP2005168128 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * abstract * [A] 10,11 [Y] 5,9; | [Y]CH318590 (GEN ELECTRIC CANADA [CA]) [Y] 5 * sentences 72-90; figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2005137117 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 9 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10037410 | WO03003541 |