EP2427210 - MODULATION OF INDUCIBLE NITRIC OXIDE (INOS) BINDING TO SPRY DOMAIN-CONTAINING SOCS-BOX PEPTIDES (SSB) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Walter and Eliza Hall Institute of Medical Research 1G Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | [2012/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLESNIK, Tatiana 1G Royal Parade Parkville Melbourne, Victoria 3052 / AU | 02 /
KUANG, Zhihe Wehi 1G Royal Parade Parkville Melbourne, Victoria 3052 / AU | 03 /
LEWIS, Rowena Sue 1G Royal Parade Parkville Melbourne, Victoria 3052 / AU | 04 /
NICHOLSON, Sandra Elaine Wehi 1G Royal Parade Parkville Melbourne, Victoria 3052 / AU | 05 /
NORTON, Ray Wehi 1G Royal Parade Parkville Melbourne, Victoria 3052 / AU | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh & Windsor Churchill Court 3 Manor Royal Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh and Windsor Ltd Unit 65, Basepoint Metcalf Way Crawley, West Sussex RH11 7XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10771902.3 | 06.05.2010 | WO2010AU00525 | Priority number, date | US20090176637P | 08.05.2009 Original published format: US 176637 P | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010127400 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2427210 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K48/00, C07K7/08, C12N9/02, A61K38/10, A61P31/00, C07K16/18, G01N33/50, A61K38/43, A61P33/00, C07K16/40 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N9/0075 (EP,US);
C12Y114/13039 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0337 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Title | German: | MODULATION DER BINDUNG VON INDUZIERBARER STICKOXIDSYNTHASE (INOS) AN SPRY-DOMAIN-HALTIGE SOCS-BOX-PEPTIDE (SSB) | [2012/11] | English: | MODULATION OF INDUCIBLE NITRIC OXIDE (INOS) BINDING TO SPRY DOMAIN-CONTAINING SOCS-BOX PEPTIDES (SSB) | [2012/11] | French: | MODULATION DE LA LIAISON DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE SYNTHASE INDUCTIBLE (INOS) À DES PEPTIDES SOCS-BOX (SSB) CONTENANT DES DOMAINES SPRY | [2012/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 08.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9820023 (INST MEDICAL W & E HALL [AU], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0037636 (INST MEDICAL W & E HALL [AU], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A] - WANG DAKUN ET AL, "The SPRY domain-containing SOCS box protein 1 (SSB-1) interacts with MET and enhances the hepatocyte growth factor-induced Erk-Elk-1-serum response element pathway", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20050401), vol. 280, no. 16, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 16393 - 16401, XP002683005 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M413897200 | [XP] - KUANG ZHIHE ET AL, "The SPRY domain-containing SOCS box protein SPSB2 targets iNOS for proteasomal degradation", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (201007), vol. 190, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 129 - 141, XP002683006 [XP] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/JCB.200912087 | International search | [X]WO0023622 (VALIGENE CORP [US]); | [A]US2002147307 (HILTON DOUGLAS J [AU], et al) | [A] - MASTERS, S.L. ET AL., "Genetic Deletion of Murine SPRY Domain-Containing SOCS Box Protein 2 (SSB-2) Results in Very Mild Thrombocytopenia", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (200507), vol. 25, no. 13, pages 5639 - 5647, XP008154650 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.25.13.5639-5647.2005 | [A] - STYHLER, S ET AL., "VASA Localization Requires the SPRY-Domain and SOCS-Box Containing Protein, GUSTAVUS", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, (2002), vol. 3, pages 865 - 876, XP008154673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1534-5807(02)00361-1 | [A] - XING, Y ET AL., "Murine homologues of the Drosophila gustavus gene are expressed in ovarian granulosa cells", REPRODUCTION, (2006), vol. 131, pages 905 - 915, XP008154649 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/rep.1.01046 | [A] - QASIMI, P ET AL., "Divergent Mechanisms Utilized by SOCS3 to Mediate Interleukin- 10 Inhibition of Tumor Necrosis Factor a and Nitric Oxide Production by Macrophages", J BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, no. 10, pages 6316 - 6324, XP055036119 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M508608200 | by applicant | US2007004667 | - "Peptide Backbone Modifications", SPATOLA, Chemistry and Biochemistry of Amino Acids, Peptides and Proteins, MARCELL DEKKER, (1983), vol. 7, pages 267 - 357 | - ALMEIDA; ALLSHIRE, TRENDS CELL BIOL, (2005), vol. 15, pages 251 - 258 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - CONSTANTINI ET AL., CANCER BIOTHERM RADIOPHARM, (2008), vol. 23, pages 3 - 24 | - DE CASTRO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2006), vol. 34, page W362 | - DE COUPADE ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (2005), vol. 390, pages 407 - 418 | - DESHAYES ET AL., ADV DRUG DELIV REV, (2008), vol. 60, pages 537 - 47 | - DICKINS ET AL., NAT. GENET, (2005), vol. 37, pages 1289 - 1295 | - DICKIN ET AL., NAT. GENET, (2006), vol. 39, pages 914 - 921 | - DOSZTANYI ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 21, pages 3433 - 3434 | - DUBRIDGE ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1987), vol. 7, pages 379 - 387 |