EP2427526 - USE OF SOLID BETAINE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/11] | USE OF SOLID BETAINE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | ||
[2019/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [2019/46] |
Former [2016/20] | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | ||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Dupont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Danisco A/S Langebrogade 1 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NURMI, Juha Nahkurinpiha 2 FI-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | 02 /
JUTILA, Kirsti Rantapolku 2 B 10 FI-02170 Espoo / FI | 03 /
PAANANEN, Hannu Niittypolku 14 FI-02460 Kantvik / FI | 04 /
ERIKSSON, Kristian Metsäläntie 25 FI-21250 Masku / FI | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/32] | Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2012/11] | Sahlin, Jonna Elisabeth, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10772067.4 | 06.05.2010 | [2019/46] | WO2010FI50369 | Priority number, date | FI20090005522 | 08.05.2009 Original published format: FI 20095522 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010128212 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2427526 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2427526 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 11.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, C07C229/12, C07C227/40, E01H10/00, B01J2/30 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
C09K3/185 (EP,FI,US);
B01J2/30 (FI);
C07C227/40 (EP,FI,US);
C07C229/12 (FI);
E01H10/00 (FI)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/40, C07C229/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG ENES FESTEN BETAINPRODUKTS | [2019/27] | English: | USE OF SOLID BETAINE PRODUCT | [2019/27] | French: | UTILISATION DE PRODUIT SOLIDE À BASE DE BÉTAÏNE | [2019/27] |
Former [2012/11] | VERWENDUNG ENES FESTEN BETAINPRODUKTS UND VEFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2012/11] | USE OF SOLID BETAINE PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | ||
Former [2012/11] | UTILISATION DE PRODUIT SOLIDE À BASE DE BÉTAÏNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 10.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2010 | AL | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | IE | 06.05.2020 | LU | 06.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.05.2010 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 13.11.2019 | |
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1664808 (KURSK POLT I [SU]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XI]WO02090463 (FORTUM OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1-12,14 * claims 6-9 * [I] 13; | [X]WO2007128878 (FINNFEEDS FINLAND OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-6, 9-11 * * page 5, line 12 - line 15 * | International search | [A]US1901111 (REISUKE MASUDA); | [X]EP0054544 (SUOMEN SOKERI OY [FI]); | [A]US6080330 (BLOOMER TODD A [US]); | [A]WO2004009727 (BLOOMER TODD A [US]); | [X]WO2007128878 (FINNFEEDS FINLAND OY [FI], et al) | by applicant | SU1664808 | WO02090463 | EP1015106 | WO2007128878 |