EP2424990 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC IMMUNE RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Tzyy-Choou 11002 Nacirema Lane Stevenson MD 21153 / US | 02 /
HUNG, Chien-Fu 13 Ballyhean Court Timonium MD 21093 / US | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10772568.1 | 28.04.2010 | WO2010US32779 | Priority number, date | US20090173413P | 28.04.2009 Original published format: US 173413 P | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010129339 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2424990 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/12, A61P35/00, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C12N15/85 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4644 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K35/13 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | C12N15/63, C12N15/85, C12N15/12, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG ANTIGENSPEZIFISCHER IMMUNREAKTIONEN | [2012/10] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC IMMUNE RESPONSES | [2012/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER DES RÉPONSES IMMUNITAIRES SPÉCIFIQUES D'ANTIGÈNE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 06.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 01.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/25] | 05.02.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006120474 (OXXON THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15* examples 1-11 *; | [XI]WO2007071997 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-13,15 * examples 7,8 * [I] 6,8,14; | [I]WO2009007336 (GENIMMUNE N V [BE], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 1-4 *; | [XI] - ROSA MARIA DIAZ ET AL, "Oncolytic immunovirotherapy for melanoma using vesicular stomatitis virus", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, vol. 67, no. 6, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-3974, ISSN 0008-5472, (20070101), pages 2840 - 2848, (20070315), XP008154520 [X] 1-4,6-15 * figures 5,6 * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-3974 | International search | [A]US2004106128 (MAJUMDAR ANISH SEN [US], et al); | [X] - CHEN, C-H. ET AL., "Boosting with recombinant vaccinia increases HPV-16 E7-specific T cell precursor frequencies of HPV-16 E7-expressing DNA vaccines.", VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(99)00528-9, pages 2015 - 2022, XP004202497 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(99)00528-9 | [X] - KIM, T. W. ET AL., "DNA vaccines employing intracellular targeting strategies and a strategy to prolong dendritic cell life generate a higher number of CD8+ memory T cells and better long-term antitumor effects compared with a DNA prime-vaccinia boost regimen.", HUM. GENE THER., (2005), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 26 - 34 | [XP] - CHUANG, C-M. ET AL., "Combination of viral oncology and tumor-specific immunity to control established tumors.", CLIN. CANCER RES., (20090715), vol. 15, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-2685, pages 4581 - 4588, XP055055082 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-2685 |