EP2427848 - ACCESSING, COMPRESSING, AND TRACKING MEDIA STORED IN AN OPTICAL DISC STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi-LG Data Storage Korea, Inc. LG Gasan Digital Center 459-9 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-803 / KR | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Powerfile, Inc. 1165 Triton Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESENER, Jonathan, M. c/o Powerfile Inc. 1100 La Avenida St Ste A Mountain View, CA 94043-1453 / US | 02 /
GASKILL, Steven c/o Powerfile Inc. 1100 La Avenida St Ste A Mountain View, CA 94043-1453 / US | 03 /
POPELKA, Paul c/o Powerfile Inc. 1100 La Avenida St Ste A Mountain View, CA 94043-1453 / US | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10772914.7 | 07.05.2010 | WO2010US34122 | Priority number, date | US20090176697P | 08.05.2009 Original published format: US 176697 P | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010129921 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2427848 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F17/30 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
G06F3/0664 (EP,US);
G06F12/02 (KR);
G06F16/113 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F3/0623 (EP,US);
G06F3/0661 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/11] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Title | German: | ZUGRIFF, KOMPRIMIERUNG UND ORTUNG VON IN EINEM OPTISCHEN DATENSPEICHERSYSTEM GESPEICHERTEN MEDIEN | [2012/11] | English: | ACCESSING, COMPRESSING, AND TRACKING MEDIA STORED IN AN OPTICAL DISC STORAGE SYSTEM | [2012/11] | French: | ACCÈS À DES SUPPORTS STOCKÉS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE À DISQUES OPTIQUES, ET COMPRESSION ET SUIVI DE CES SUPPORTS | [2012/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 14.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5040110 (MIKI TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [I]US5590320 (MAXEY DAVID [US]) [I] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 6 * * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2003103073 (YOKOYAMA TORU [JP]); | [Y]US2004167935 (MARGOLUS NORMAN H [US]); | [Y]US2007168398 (MIROSHNICHENKO ALEX [US], et al); | [Y]US2008091894 (RETNAMMA MANOJ V [US], et al); | [Y]US2009049224 (JUSTISS STEVEN A [US], et al) |