EP2320448 - PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Shinsuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KAWASE, Akira c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MORIOKA, Kazuhiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
HAZE, Naoto c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
OTA, Yoshiyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
FUJITANI, Morio c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
ITO, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
MIFUNE, Tatsuo c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 10772947.7 | 23.06.2010 | [2011/19] | WO2010JP04166 | Priority number, date | JP20090148314 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009148314 | JP20090148315 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009148315 | JP20090148316 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009148316 | JP20090159522 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009159522 | [2011/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010150533 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320448 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J11/02 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H01J11/38 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASMAANZEIGETAFEL | [2011/19] | English: | PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL | [2011/19] | French: | ECRAN À PLASMA | [2011/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | Translation filed | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 18.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004277212 (OKUNO CHEM IND CO); | [X]JP2009102222 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007297265 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2006143479 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2007302510 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JP2009120472 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) | by applicant | JP2003128430 |