EP2483421 - PREPARATION OF RESTRICTION ENDONUCLEASES IN IVCS USING FRET AND FACS SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REMasters Sp. z.o.o. Bobrzynskiego 14 30-348 Kraków / PL | [2013/43] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Lower, Michal Sielecka 50 m. 35 00-738 Warsaw / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lower, Michael Sielecka 50 m. 35 00-738 Warsaw / PL | [2013/43] |
Former [2012/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kondrat, Mariusz Kondrat & Partners Al. Niepodleglosci 223/1 02-087 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Kondrat, Mariusz Kondrat Law and Patent Office Al. Niepodleglosci 223/1 02 087 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 10773417.0 | 28.09.2010 | WO2010PL00099 | Priority number, date | PL20090389135 | 28.09.2009 Original published format: PL 38913509 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011037485 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483421 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N21/64, G01N33/58 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/1086 (EP,US);
C12N15/1075 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON RESTRIKTIONS-ENDONUKLEASEN IN IVCS DURCH FRET- UND FACS-AUSWAHL | [2012/32] | English: | PREPARATION OF RESTRICTION ENDONUCLEASES IN IVCS USING FRET AND FACS SELECTION | [2012/32] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'ENDONUCLÉASES DE RESTRICTION DANS DES IVC À L'AIDE D'UNE SÉLECTION PAR FRET ET FACS | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5843658 (UCHIYAMA HISATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 3 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,2; | [A]WO2004088314 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 4, paragraphs 4,5 * * claims 1,2,7,18,19,21,28,29 *; | [A]US2007077572 (TAWFIK DAN [IL], et al) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0117] - [0120] - [0156] *; | [A] - ZHENG YU ET AL, "Selection of restriction endonucleases using artificial cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20070612), vol. 35, no. 11, doi:DOI:10.1093/NAR/GKM410, ISSN 0305-1048, pages E83.1 - E83.10, XP002485450 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1, column r, paragraph 3 - page 2, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 3, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 9, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkm410 | [A] - DOI NOBUHIDE ET AL, "In vitro selection of restriction endonucleases by in vitro compartmentalization", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20040101), vol. 32, no. 12, doi:DOI:10.1093/NAR/GNH096, ISSN 0305-1048, pages E95.1 - E95.8, XP002485451 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1, column r, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 4, column r, paragraph 3 - page 5, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 6, column r, paragraph 2 - page 7, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gnh096 | by applicant | - BERNATH K; HAI M; MASTROBATTISTA E; GRIFFITHS AD; MAGDASSI S; TAWFIK DS, "In vitro compartmentalization by double emulsions: sorting and gene enrichment by fluorescence activated cell sorting", ANAL BIOCHEM., (20040201), vol. 325, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ab.2003.10.005, pages 151 - 7, XP004483545 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2003.10.005 | - DOI N; KUMADAKI S; OISHI Y; MATSUMURA N; YANAGAWA H, "In vitro selection of restriction endonucleases by in vitro compartmentalization", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20040706), page 32 | - EISENSCHMIDT K; LANIO T; JELTSCH A; PINGOUD A, "A fluorimetric assay for on-line detection of DNA cleavage by restriction endonucleases", J BIOTECHNOL., (20020626), vol. 96, no. 2, pages 185 - 91 | - FARINAS ET; BULTER T; ARNOLD FH, "Directed enzyme evolution", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL., (200112), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(01)00261-0, pages 545 - 51, XP002551042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(01)00261-0 | - GHOSH SS; EIS PS; BLUMEYER K; FEARON K; MILLAR DP, "Real time kinetics of restriction endonuclease cleavage monitored by fluorescence resonance energy transfer", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19940811), vol. 22, no. 15, pages 3155 - 9, XP002054293 | - GRIFFITHS AD; TAWFIK DS., "Miniaturising the laboratory in emulsion droplets", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (200609), vol. 24, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibtech.2006.06.009, pages 395 - 402, XP025052247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2006.06.009 | - KIM TW; KEUM JW; OH IS; CHOI CY; PARK CG; KIM DM, "Simple procedures for the construction of a robust and cost-effective cell-free protein synthesis system", J BIOTECHNOL., (20061201), vol. 126, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2006.05.014, pages 554 - 61, XP024956587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2006.05.014 | - O'HARE HM; JOHNSSON K, "The laboratory in a droplet", CHEM. BIOL., (2007), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2005.11.006, pages 1255 - 1257, XP005210938 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2005.11.006 | - RIMSELIENE R; MANELIENE Z; LUBYS A; JANULAITIS A, "Engineering of restriction endonucleases: using methylation activity of the bifunctional endonuclease Eco57I to select the mutant with a novel sequence specificity", J MOL BIOL., (20030321), vol. 327, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(03)00142-6, pages 383 - 91, XP004454143 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(03)00142-6 | - ROBERTS RJ; VINCZE T; POSFAI J; MACELIS D., "REBASE--enzymes and genes for DNA restriction and modification", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (200701), page 35 | - ZHENG Y; ROBERTS RJ, "Selection of restriction endonucleases using artificial cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2007), page 35 |