EP2494815 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING DELIVERY OF DATA PACKETS TO A USER EQUIPMENT IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATARAJAN, Balamurali G7 RK Prakrith Enclave Block 20 Hoysala Nagar Rammurthy Nagar Bangalore 560 016 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
ARULSELVAN, Naveen C606 Celestial Green Apartments Old Madras Road C.V. Raman Nagar Post Bangalore 460 093 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
CHHAWCHHARIA, Manjari F1 Royal Oak 3rd Main 4th Cross Defense Colony Bangalore 560 008 / IN | 04 /
KAMBLE, Vihang, Gangaram, G. 203 Vars Crystal Pai Layout Bangalore 560 016 Karnataka / IN | 05 /
KALYANASUNDARAM, Suresh A-201 1089/882 N. Thippasandra Mn. Rd. HAL III Stage Bangalore 560 075 Karnataka / IN | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10773468.3 | 20.10.2010 | WO2010US53289 | Priority number, date | IN2009DEL2250 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: IN DE22502009 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053490 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494815 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494815 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04L1/18, H04W36/02, // H04W84/04, H04L1/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/15521 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/0016 (US);
H04L1/1809 (US);
H04W36/02 (US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MELDUNG DER LIEFERUNG VON DATENPAKETEN AN EINE BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2012/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING DELIVERY OF DATA PACKETS TO A USER EQUIPMENT IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION DE DISTRIBUTION DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES À UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 07.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14162232.4 / EP2750319 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2010 | AL | 07.05.2014 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | RS | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | SM | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | IE | 20.10.2014 | LU | 20.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MK | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008062911 (CHOI JIN-GHOO [KR], et al); | [I]US2008117877 (MIN CHAN-HO [KR], et al) |