EP2498894 - IMPROVED CEMENT TO MAKE THERMAL SHOCK RESISTANT CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURES AND METHOD TO MAKE THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PYZIK, Aleksander 3012 Scarborough Lane Midland MI 48640 / US | 02 /
SHINKEL, Nicholas 1040 E. Wilder Road Bay City MI 48706 / US | 03 /
PRUNIER JR., Arthur R. 711 Linwood Drive Midland MI 48640 / US | 04 /
GOSS, Janet 2323 Willard Street Saginaw MI 48602 / US | 05 /
YANG, Kwanho 517 Stillmeadow Lane Midland MI 48642 / US | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/38] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10773502.9 | 27.10.2010 | WO2010US54184 | Priority number, date | US20090260043P | 11.11.2009 Original published format: US 260043 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011059699 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498894 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/00, C04B37/00, C04B38/00, F01N3/00 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
B01D46/2448 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/2429 (KR,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/20 (KR);
B01D46/2425 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/2444 (KR);
B01D46/24491 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/24492 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/24494 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/24495 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/2478 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,KR,US);
C04B26/285 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/185 (EP,KR,US);
C04B37/003 (KR);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B38/0019 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/2084 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/343 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/322 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2237/062 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2237/341 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2237/597 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2237/708 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B26/285, C04B14/024, C04B14/041, C04B14/10, C04B14/303, C04B14/324, C04B38/0019 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006, C04B35/185, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074, C04B38/068 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ZEMENTSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON THERMOSCHOCKBESTÄNDIGEN KERAMISCHEN WABENSTRUKTUREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2015/26] | English: | IMPROVED CEMENT TO MAKE THERMAL SHOCK RESISTANT CERAMIC HONEYCOMB STRUCTURES AND METHOD TO MAKE THEM | [2012/38] | French: | CIMENT AMELIORE POUR LA FABRICATION DE STRUCTURES CÉRAMIQUES EN NID D'ABEILLE RÉSISTANT AUX CHOCS THERMIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLES-CI | [2015/26] |
Former [2012/38] | VERBESSERTER ZEMENT ZUR HERSTELLUNG WÄRMESCHOCKRESISTENTER KERAMIKWABENSTRUKTUREN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2012/38] | CIMENT AMÉLIORÉ POUR FABRIQUER DES STRUCTURES CÉRAMIQUES EN NID D'ABEILLE RÉSISTANTES AUX CHOCS THERMIQUES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1974789 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2008117611 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP1997790 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [X]EP2008985 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [X]US2009239030 (CAI JUN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4304585 | US4329162 | US4335783 | US4416676 | US4417908 | US4642210 | US4652286 | US4953627 | US5098455 | US5173349 | US5194154 | US5198007 | JPH0647620 | US5322537 | US5340516 | US5914187 | EP1142619 | US6306335 | US2001038810 | WO02070106 | WO03051488 | US6596665 | WO03082773 | US6669751 | WO2004011386 | WO2004011124 | US2004020359 | EP1508355 | EP1508356 | EP1516659 | US2006197265 | US7112233 | US7425297 |