EP2470901 - USE OF IMMUNOREGULATORY NK CELL POPULATIONS FOR PREDICTING THE EFFICACY OF ANTI-IL-2R ANTIBODIES IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Biotherapeutics Corp. 1500 Seaport Boulevard Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Abbott Biotherapeutics Corp. 1500 Seaport Boulevard Redwood City CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERIDAN III, James Peter 1058 Tulane Drive Mountain View California 94040 / US | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/27] | Application number, filing date | 10773516.9 | 29.10.2010 | WO2010US54699 | Priority number, date | US20090256761P | 30.10.2009 Original published format: US 256761 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053777 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470901 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/564 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
G01N33/6869 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N2333/7155 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | 28.03.2012 | ME | 28.03.2012 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON IMMUNREGULATORISCHEN NK-ZELLPOPULATIONEN ZUR VORHERSAGE DER WIRKSAMKEIT VON ANTI-IL-2R-ANTIKÖRPERN BEI PATIENTEN MIT MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | [2012/27] | English: | USE OF IMMUNOREGULATORY NK CELL POPULATIONS FOR PREDICTING THE EFFICACY OF ANTI-IL-2R ANTIBODIES IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS PATIENTS | [2012/27] | French: | UTILISATION DE POPULATIONS DE CELLULES NK IMMUNORÉGULATRICES POUR PRÉDIRE L'EFFICACITÉ D'ANTICORPS ANTI-IL-2R DANS DES PATIENTS ATTEINTS DE SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 01.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA] - BIELEKOVA BIBIANA ET AL, "Effect of anti-CD25 antibody daclizumab in the inhibition of inflammation and stabilization of disease progression in multiple sclerosis", ARCHIVES OF NEUROLOGY, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20090401), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0003-9942, pages 483 - 489, XP009129266 [X] 34,36-51 * p. 484/485, "Study Treatment" * [A] 1-33,35 | [XA] - LINKER RALF A ET AL, "Innovative monoclonal antibody therapies in multiple sclerosis.", THERAPEUTIC ADVANCES IN NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, (200807), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1756-2856, pages 33 - 42, XP002617116 [X] 34,36-51 * abstract * * "Daclizumab"; page 39 - page 40 * [A] 1-33,35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1756285608093945 | [A] - SHERIDAN J ET AL, "Expansion of CD56bright NK cells correlates with therapeutic response to daclizumab in multiple sclerosis", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200909), Database accession no. PREV200900588640, XP002617117 [A] 1-51 * abstract * | [A] - JP.Sheridan et al, "Expansion of CD65bright NK Cells Correlates with Therapeutic Response to Daclizumab in Multiple sclerosis", (20090909), URL: http://facetbiotech.com/images/uploads/pdfs/ECTRIMS_P430_DAC_poster_2009.pdf, (20010114) [A] 1-51 * the whole document * | [A] - BIELEKOVA BIBIANA ET AL, "Regulatory CD56(bright) natural killer cells mediate immunomodulatory effects of IL-2Ralpha-targeted therapy (daclizumab) in multiple sclerosis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US, vol. 103, no. 15, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0601335103, ISSN 0027-8424, (20060411), pages 5941 - 5946, (20060403), XP002605860 [A] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0601335103 | [AP] - WYNN DANIEL ET AL, "Daclizumab in active relapsing multiple sclerosis (CHOICE study): a phase 2, randomised, double-blind, placebo-controlled, add-on trial with interferon beta", LANCET NEUROLOGY, LANCET PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1474-4422(10)70033-8, ISSN 1474-4422, (20100401), pages 381 - 390, (20100215), XP002605861 [AP] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1474-4422(10)70033-8 | by applicant | US5530101 | US5585089 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US6180370 | EP0239400 | WO9109967 | US5225539 | EP0592106 | EP0519596 | US5565332 | US5011684 | US5152980 | US5336489 | US5510105 | US5571507 | US5587162 | US5607675 | US5674494 | US5916559 | US2003138417 | US2006029599 | - MONTALBAN, X. ET AL., MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (200710), vol. 13, no. 2, pages S18 - S18 | - KAUFINAN, M.D. ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (20080311), vol. 70, no. 11, pages A220 - A220 | - WAHL ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1983), vol. 24, page 316 | - GLENN E. MORRIS,, Methods in Molecular Biology, (1996), vol. 66 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), page 563 681 | - PADLAN, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, page 489 498 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROT. ENG., (1994), vol. 7, page 805 814 | - ROGUSKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 969 973 | - BAAN ET AL., TRANSPLANT. PROC., (2001), vol. 33, pages 224 - 2246 | - BIELEKOVA, B. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 5941 - 5946 | - SHERIDAN, JP ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2009), vol. 72, no. 11, pages A35 - A35 | - PERINI ET AL., J NEUROLOGY, (2004), vol. 251, pages 305 - 309 | - SORENSEN ET AL., LANCET, (2003), vol. 362, pages 184 - 191 | - PACHNER, NEUROLOGY, (2003), vol. 61, no. 5, pages S2 - S5 | - FARRELL ET AL., MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (2008), vol. 14, pages 212 - 218 | - SORENSEN ET AL., LANCET, (2003), vol. 362, pages 1184 - 1191 | - LEE ET AL., BRAIN, (1999), vol. 122, pages 1211 - 2 | - MALUCCHI ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2004), vol. 62, pages 2031 - 2037 | - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1989), vol. 86, pages 1029 - 1033 | - LEHKY ET AL., ANN. NEURO., (1998), vol. 44, pages 942 - 947 | - NUSSENBLATT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 7462 - 7466 | - KAUFMAN, M.D., NEUROLOGY, (20080311), vol. 70, no. 11, pages A220 - A220 |