EP2431365 - AZETIDINE COMPOUND AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGASHIRA, Kazutaka c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 02 /
IKENOGAMI, Taku c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Naoki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Tatsuya c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 05 /
OKA, Takahiro c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 06 /
MATSUO, Takuya c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 07 /
YAMASAKI, Takayuki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10774995.4 | 14.05.2010 | WO2010JP58188 | Priority number, date | JP20090117813 | 14.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009117813 | US20090216820P | 21.05.2009 Original published format: US 216820 P | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/12] | JP20090117813 | 14.05.2009 | |
US20090216820 | 21.05.2009 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010131738 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431365 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/4427, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4545, A61K31/497, A61K31/551, A61P13/12, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07D413/14 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | BA | 14.12.2011 | ME | 14.12.2011 | RS | 14.12.2011 | Title | German: | AZETIDIN-VERBINDUNG UND IHRE MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2012/12] | English: | AZETIDINE COMPOUND AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF | [2012/12] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'AZÉTIDINE ET SON UTILISATION MÉDICINALE | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | Translation filed | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 04.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007071955 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-24 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]WO2007119046 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2008029084 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB], et al) |