EP2494285 - REFRIGERATION DEVICE COMPRISING AN ICE MAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKE, Christoph Kolbermoorer Str. 15A 83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | 02 /
EICHER, Max Laimer Platz 1a 80689 München / DE | 03 /
EISELE, Frank Oderstr. 1 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 04 /
STAUD, Ralph Wörthstr. 30 81667 München / DE | 05 /
TISCHER, Thomas Jagdstraße 9 85540 Haar / DE | [2014/16] |
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
BECKE, Christoph Kolbermoorer Str. 15A 83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | ||
02 /
EICHER, Max Aldegreverstr. 22 80687 München / DE | |||
03 /
EISELE, Frank Oderstr. 1 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | |||
04 /
STAUD, Ralph Wörthstr. 30 81667 München / DE | |||
05 /
TISCHER, Thomas Jagdstraße 9 85540 Haar / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10775755.1 | 22.10.2010 | [2021/18] | WO2010EP65920 | Priority number, date | DE20091046029 | 27.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009046029 | [2012/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011051167 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2494285 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494285 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/04, F25C1/22, F25C1/24, F25C5/185, F25C1/25 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F25D23/04 (EP);
F25C1/25 (EP);
F25C1/24 (EP);
F25C2400/06 (EP);
F25C2400/10 (EP);
F25C2500/06 (EP);
F25C5/185 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | F25C1/22, F25D23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEGERÄT MIT EISBEREITER | [2012/36] | English: | REFRIGERATION DEVICE COMPRISING AN ICE MAKER | [2012/36] | French: | APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE MACHINE À GLAÇONS | [2021/01] |
Former [2012/36] | APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE EQUIPE D'UNE MACHINE A GLAÇONS | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 19.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2010 | AL | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | AT | 22.10.2021 | GB | 22.10.2021 | IE | 22.10.2021 | LU | 22.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | FR | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.10.2010 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/41] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
FR | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
GB | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | ES | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | ES | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | ES | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008020723 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,13,16-19 * page 14, line 10 - page 16, line 12 * * page 20, line 2 - line 6 * * page 31, line 20 - page 38, line 11 * * page 45, line 27 - page 48, line 2 * * page 49, line 26 - page 51, line 5 * * figures 4-7,18-27,39-41 * [I] 10,12,14,15; | [XY]WO2008100018 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,13-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US1740919 (COPEMAN LLOYD G) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [XI]JPH05296623 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1-14 * [I] 4-7,19; | [XA]WO2009110678 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0075] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 6-8,11,13-16; | [A]JPS61175872U (ANONYMOUS) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE102006017804 |