EP2509974 - PYRAZOLES DERIVATIVES MODULATORS OF CALCIUM RELEASE-ACTIVATED CALCIUM CHANNEL AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NON-SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/42] | PYRAZOLES DERIVATIVES MODULATORS OF CALCIUM RELEASE -ACTIVATED CALCIUM CHANNEL AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NON- SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER | ||
[2017/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhizen Pharmaceuticals S.A. Fritz Courvoisier 40 2300 La Chaux de Fonds / CH | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTHUPPALANIAPPAN, Meyyappan c/o Incozen Therapeutics Pvt. Ltd. "Spectrum" Discovery Zone SP Biotech Park Phase I Shameerpet Hyderabad 500 078 / IN | 02 /
VISWANADHA, Srikant c/o Incozen Therapeutics Pvt. Ltd. "Spectrum" Discovery Zone SP Biotech Park Phase I Shameerpet Hyderabad 500 078 / IN | 03 /
VARANASI, Kanthikiran, Vs. c/o Incozen Therapeutics Pvt. Ltd. "Spectrum" Discovery Zone SP Biotech Park Phase I Shameerpet Hyderabad 500 078 / IN | 04 /
MERIKAPUDI, Gayatri, Swaroop c/o Incozen Therapeutics Pvt. Ltd. "Spectrum" Discovery Zone SP Biotech Park Phase I Shameerpet Hyderabad 500 078 / IN | 05 /
VAKKALANKA, Swaroop, Kumar, V., S. c/o Rhizen Pharmaceuticals SA Fritz Courvoisier 40 CH-2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / IN | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2012/42] | Pons Ariño, Angel Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10776149.6 | 07.10.2010 | [2018/15] | WO2010IB02539 | Priority number, date | IN2009CHE2439 | 08.10.2009 Original published format: IN 2439CH2009 | IN2009CHE2636 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: IN 2636CH2009 | IN2010CHE158 | 25.01.2010 Original published format: IN 158CH2010 | IN2010CHE1513 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: IN 1513CH2010 | IN2010CHE1514 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: IN 1514CH2010 | IN2010CHE2385 | 19.08.2010 Original published format: IN 2385CH2010 | US20090265540P | 01.12.2009 Original published format: US 265540 P | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/42] | IN2009CHE2439 | 08.10.2009 | |
IN2009CHE2636 | 30.10.2009 | ||
IN2010CHE0158 | 25.01.2010 | ||
IN2010CHE1513 | 02.06.2010 | ||
IN2010CHE1514 | 02.06.2010 | ||
IN2010CHE2385 | 19.08.2010 | ||
US20090265540P | 01.12.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011042798 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2509974 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2509974 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/4155 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
C07D473/34 (EP,CN,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4155 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/4192 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRAZOLDERIVATE ALS MODULATOREN DES CALCIUM-RELEASE-AKTIVIERTEN CALCIUMKANALS UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NICHT-KLEINZELLIGEM BRONCHIALKARZINOM | [2012/42] | English: | PYRAZOLES DERIVATIVES MODULATORS OF CALCIUM RELEASE-ACTIVATED CALCIUM CHANNEL AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NON-SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER | [2017/47] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRAZOLE EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DU CANAL CALCIQUE ACTIVÉ PAR LA LIBÉRATION DE CALCIUM ET MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT POUR LE CANCER DU POUMON À CELLULES NON PETITES | [2012/42] |
Former [2012/42] | PYRAZOLES DERIVATIVES MODULATORS OF CALCIUM RELEASE -ACTIVATED CALCIUM CHANNEL AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF NON- SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 27.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.04.2018 | [2018/46] | Cited in | International search | [IP]WO2010048559 (CALCIMEDICA INC [US], et al) [IP] 1-101 * paragraph [0002] * * claims 1,7 *; | [Y]EP1875925 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [Y] 1-101 * paragraph [0008] * * claim 4 *; | [Y]WO2009076454 (CALCIMEDICA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-101 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0007] , [ and 0015]; claim 1 * | [YD] - YONETOKU Y ET AL, "Novel potent and selective Ca<2+> release-activated Ca<2+> (CRAC) channel inhibitors. Part 3: Synthesis and CRAC channel inhibitory activity of 4'-[(trifluoromethyl)pyrazol-1-yl]carboxanilides", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 16, no. 21, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.BMC.2008.09.047, ISSN 0968-0896, (20081101), pages 9457 - 9466, (20080920), XP025545771 [YD] 1-101 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2008.09.047 | [Y] - YONETOKU Y ET AL, "Novel potent and selective calcium-release-activated calcium (CRAC) channel inhibitors. Part 1: Synthesis and inhibitory activity of 5-(1-methyl-3-trifluoromethyl-1H-pyrazol-5-yl)-2-thiophenecarboxamides", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 14, no. 14, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.BMC.2006.03.024, ISSN 0968-0896, (20060715), pages 4750 - 4760, (20060715), XP025133377 [Y] 1-101 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2006.03.024 | [I] - YONETOKU Y ET AL, "Novel potent and selective calcium-release-activated calcium (CRAC) channel inhibitors. Part 2: Synthesis and inhibitory activity of aryl-3-trifluoromethylpyrazoles", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 14, no. 15, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.BMC.2006.03.039, ISSN 0968-0896, (20060801), pages 5370 - 5383, (20060801), XP025133434 [I] 1-101 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2006.03.039 |