EP2516039 - MODULAR COMPACT ADSORPTION BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESAI, Ashwin 2336 Founders Way Saugus MA 01906 / US | 02 /
CELIK, Cem, E. 1218 Majestic Woods Drive Grand Island NY 14072 / US | 03 /
ACKLEY, Mark, William 96 Church Street East Aurora NY 14052 / US | 04 /
SMOLAREK, James 6696 Liebler Road Boston NY 14025 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
DESAI, Ashwin 90 Groton Dr. Apt.1 Amherst NY 14228 / US | ||
02 /
CELIK, Cem, E. 1218 Majestic Woods Drive Grand Island NY 14072 / US | |||
03 /
ACKLEY, Mark, William 96 Church Street East Aurora NY 14052 / US | |||
04 /
SMOLAREK, James 6696 Liebler Road Boston NY 14025 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10776904.4 | 05.11.2010 | WO2010US55601 | Priority number, date | US20090646183 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: US 646183 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011087555 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2516039 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
B01D53/0407 (EP,US);
B01D53/0415 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | MODULARES KOMPAKTES ADSORPTIONSBETT | [2012/44] | English: | MODULAR COMPACT ADSORPTION BED | [2012/44] | French: | ADSORPTION EN LITS COMPACTS ET MODULAIRES | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/52] | 25.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US711187 (STONE GEORGE C [US]) [I] 1-18 * page 1, lines 13-92; figure - * [Y] 19; | [Y]US2080578 (RAY ARTHUR B) [Y] 19 * page 1, column 1, line 45 - page 1, column 2, line 20; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US3186149 (AYERS JOSEPH G) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 9 - column 4, line 31; figure - *; | [A]US3590561 (MARBLE ROBERT I) [A] 1-19 * figure - *; | [XYI]US5290345 (OSENDORF RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,14,15 * column 8, lines 11-56; figures 1,12,19 * [Y] 19 [I] 3,10-13,16-18; | [A] - A.S.PUSHNOV, "Calculation of average bed porosity", CHEMICAL AND PETROLEUM ENGINEERING, (2006), vol. 42, no. 1-2, pages 14 - 16, XP002620983 [A] 11 * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10556-006-0045-x | by applicant | GB606867 | US5324159 | - W.E. GROSS; J.C. GOSHORN, "An Instrument for Determining the Volume and Bulk Density of Granular Materials", ASTM BULLETIN, (194803), pages 55 - 59 |