EP2638621 - A ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yujing Fyrbåksvägen 10 S-Västerås / SE | 02 /
TENCA, Pierluigi Via G. Soliman 6 B/32 I-16154 Genova / IT | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [2017/02] |
Former [2013/38] | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 10777010.9 | 12.11.2010 | [2017/02] | WO2010EP67374 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062376 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638621 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2638621 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K17/30, H02M7/5387, H02P27/04, H02K11/00 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H02P6/085 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE UND EIN ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2016/24] | English: | A ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2013/38] | French: | UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE TOURNANTE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2016/24] |
Former [2013/38] | ELEKTRISCHE DREHMASCHINE UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2013/38] | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 16.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2010 | AL | 11.01.2017 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | IT | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | RS | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
TR | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6028760 (FERREIRA JAN ABRAHAM [ZA]) [Y] 1-11,14-17 * column 6, lines 33-61; figures 1-4 * * column 7, lines 22-49 *; | [Y]JP2001211690 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 5,6 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1226994 (SMA REGELSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11,14-17 * sentences 12,13, paragraphs 4,7,11,14,21; figures 1-3,7,8 *; | [Y]US2002125855 (JOHNSON RONALD A [US]) [Y] 1-11,14-17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0034] , [0041]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]JP2004364352 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-11,14-17 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102005027166 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 5,6* paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0015] , [0018]; figure 1 * | Examination | US5311136 | US2007146958 | - LAMBERTZ L ET AL, "Modular converter systems for vehicle applications", EMOBILITY - ELECTRICAL POWER TRAIN, 2010, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101108), ISBN 978-1-4244-8410-2, pages 1 - 6, XP031835669 | by applicant | EP1226994 | US2002125855 | WO2006100420 |