EP2478185 - ROTARY PISTON STEAM ENGINE WITH BALANCED ROTARY VARIABLE INLET-CUT- OFF VALVE AND SECONDARY EXPANSION WITHOUT BACK-PRESSURE ON PRIMARY EXPANSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith, Errol J. 22 Avian Crescent Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | For all designated states Smith, Kenneth M. 11 Rose St. Wyee, NSW 2259 / AU | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Hamilton, Alistair AHIP PO Box 8001 Kirkcudbright DG6 9AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Hamilton, Alistair Alistair Hamilton Intellectual Property Ty Eurgain Cefn Eurgain Lane Rhosesmor Mold, Flintshire CH7 6PG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10777249.3 | 08.06.2010 | WO2010AU00706 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/30] | AU20090902320 | 22.05.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010132960 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478185 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01C20/14, F01C1/14, F01C1/18, F01L7/02 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
F01C1/18 (EP,US);
F01C20/14 (EP,US);
F04C2240/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | DREHKOLBEN-DAMPFMOTOR MIT SPIELAUSGEGLICHENEM, VARIABEL DREHBAREM EINLASSSPERRVENTIL SOWIE MIT SEKUNDÄREXPANSION OHNE DRUCKRÜCKWIRKUNG AUF EINE PRIMÄREXPANSION | [2012/30] | English: | ROTARY PISTON STEAM ENGINE WITH BALANCED ROTARY VARIABLE INLET-CUT- OFF VALVE AND SECONDARY EXPANSION WITHOUT BACK-PRESSURE ON PRIMARY EXPANSION | [2012/30] | French: | MACHINE À VAPEUR À PISTON ROTATIF AVEC SOUPAPE D'ISOLEMENT D'ADMISSION VARIABLE ROTATIVE ÉQUILIBRÉE ET DÉTENTE SECONDAIRE SANS CONTRE-PRESSION SUR DÉTENTE PRIMAIRE | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 17.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US773401 (LEIBENGUTH WALTER F [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2138050 (VICKERS HARRY F) [X] 1-15 * page 1, column 1, line 49 - page 2, column 2, line 37 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2228933 (THOMSON LEROY A) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3628893 (CARPIGIANI POERIO) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 16 - column 2, line 44 * * figures 4-8 *; | [A]US3723031 (BROWN A) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4867659 (EIERMANN DANKWART [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US6302079 (BEAL KEVIN [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03036046 (IMP RES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 2 * | International search | [A]US630124 (STAGE JOSEPH BRADLEY [US]); | [A]GB122827 (GROENEWEGEN GIJSBERTUS [NL]); | [A]US6302079 (BEAL KEVIN [US]); | [A]WO2006102696 (SMITH ERROL J [AU], et al) |