EP2433416 - CONTEXT RECOGNITION IN MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Teknologian Tutkimuskeskus VTT Vuorimiehentie 3 02044 Vtt / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖNÖNEN, Ville Kenttätie 16 A 8 FI-90100 Oulu / FI | 02 /
LIIKKA, Jussi Ritaharjuntie 40 A 3 FI-90540 Oulu / FI | 03 /
MÄNTYJÄRVI, Jani Nuottakuja 4 FI-90460 Oulunsalo / FI | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Heinonen & Co Attorneys-at-Law Ltd Fabianinkatu 29 B 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2017/17] |
Former [2012/13] | Värilä, Risto Sakari, et al IPR Partners Oy Bulevardi 2-4 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10777430.9 | 21.05.2010 | [2017/17] | WO2010FI50409 | Priority number, date | FI20090005570 | 22.05.2009 Original published format: FI 20095570 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010133770 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433416 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433416 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G06F17/30 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
H04M1/72403 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/44 (KR);
H04M1/72451 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,KR,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTEXTERKENNUNG IN MOBILGERÄTEN | [2012/13] | English: | CONTEXT RECOGNITION IN MOBILE DEVICES | [2012/13] | French: | RECONNAISSANCE DE CONTEXTE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2010 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | IE | 21.05.2017 | LU | 21.05.2017 | MT | 21.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.05.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO03043356 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,18-20 * page 7, lines 12-30 * [A] 2-7,9-17[Y] 8; | [XY]US2007099602 (KURLANDER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1,12-16,18-20 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] , [0038] , [0040] * [Y] 8; | [XY]US2009099820 (KAPLAN FREDERIC [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,11-15,18-20 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0035] , [0048] - [0052] - [0066] - [0068] - [0073] - [0075] - [0097] * [Y] 8 | International search | [A]US2004192269 (HILL THOMAS CASEY [US]); | [A] - FROELICH J. ET AL, "MyExperience: A System for In situ Tracing and Capturing of User Feedback on Mobile Phones", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE SYSTEMS, APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES, ACM NEW YORK, NY, USA, (2007), pages 57 - 70, XP008164665 | [A] - BRUNS E. ET AL, "Mobile Phone-Enabled Museum Guidance with Adaptive Classification", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20080701), pages 98 - 102, XP011229508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCG.2008.77 | [AP] - GUI F. ET AL, "A Client-Server Architecture for Context-Aware Search Application", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NETWORK-BASED INFORMATION SYSTEMS, 19.08.2009, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090819), pages 539 - 546, XP031578035 | [XP] - KONONEN V. ET AL, "Automatic feature selection for context recognition in mobile devices", PERVASIVE AND MOBILE COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, NL, (20090709), pages 181 - 197, XP026989910 |