EP2433202 - DEVICE WITH PROXIMITY DETECTION CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 6501 Willam Cannon Drive West Austin, Texas 78735 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSOINACH, Bryce T. 4413 E. Dry Creek Road Phoenix Arizona 85044 / US | 02 /
KO, Tak Kwan Vincent Flat B 10th Floor Tower 11 The Cairnhill Tsuen Wan / CN | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Wray, Antony John, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Ferro, Frodo Nunes Freescale Semiconducteurs France SAS C/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a, Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close Andover, Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10778097.5 | 03.05.2010 | WO2010US33360 | Priority number, date | US20090470729 | 22.05.2009 Original published format: US 470729 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010135072 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2433202 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02, G06F3/041, H03K17/96 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G06F1/3231 (EP,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
H03K17/9622 (EP,US);
H03K2217/960765 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | G06F3/02, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT ANNÄHERUNGSERKENNUNGSFUNKTION | [2012/13] | English: | DEVICE WITH PROXIMITY DETECTION CAPABILITY | [2012/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DOTÉ D'UNE CAPACITÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PROXIMITÉ | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JP2006145488 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * [A] 11-14 [Y] 3-6,8-10 [I] 7; | [YA]JP2007303895 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 3,11-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008]; figures 1, 2, 4 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * [A] 1,2,4-10; | [YA]US2009033343 (REYNOLDS JOSEPH K [US], et al) [Y] 4-6,8-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 1-3,7; | [A]GB2366385 (AB AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2008203977 (RAIMAR NANDAKISHORE [IN], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032]; figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPH04123736 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2008004465 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]JP2007242571 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]US2003021078 (VAN BERKEL CORNELIS [GB]); | [A]WO2009037379 (SENSEG OY [FI], et al) |