EP2432831 - THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMERS EXHIBITING SUPERIOR FOOD CONTACT COMPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolyOne Corporation 33587 Walker Road Avon Lake, OH 44012 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATASWAMY, Krishna 4011 Terry Avenue Crystal Lake IL 60014 / US | 02 /
QIAN, Guoqiang 2161 Apple Hill Lane Buffalo Grove IL 60089 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 10778207.0 | 17.05.2010 | [2018/32] | WO2010US35115 | Priority number, date | US20090179682P | 19.05.2009 Original published format: US 179682 P | US20100321697P | 07.04.2010 Original published format: US 321697 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010135244 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2432831 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2432831 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/00, C08L25/04, C08K3/26, C08J5/00, B65D6/00, C08L23/06, C08L23/08, C08L23/10, C08L23/14, // C08L23/02, C08L23/22 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/45] | C08L23/00, C08L25/04, C08K3/26, C08J5/00, B65D6/00, C08L23/06, C08L23/08, C08L23/10, C08L23/14 | ||
Former IPC [2012/13] | C08L23/00, C08L25/04, C08K3/26, C08J5/00, B65D6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE ELASTOMERE MIT HERVORRAGENDER LEBENSMITTELKONTAKTKOMPATIBILITÄT | [2012/13] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMERS EXHIBITING SUPERIOR FOOD CONTACT COMPLIANCE | [2012/13] | French: | ELASTOMÈRES THERMOPLASTIQUES PARTICULIÈREMENT RESPECTUEUX DES NORMES EN VIGUEUR EN MATIÈRE DE CONTACT AVEC LES DENRÉES ALIMENTAIRES | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 03.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE ACTEGA DS GmbH Straubinger Str. 12 28219 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Florastrasse 14 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE ACTEGA DS GmbH Straubinger Str. 12 28219 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald, Walter Gottschalk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH Splügenstrasse 8 8002 Zürich / CH | 22.05.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.02.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2010 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | IE | 17.05.2019 | LU | 17.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2024/20] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MK | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2006101966 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,8-10,12,16,19 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0135]; claims 1-7,13-16 * [I] 2-7,11,13-15,17,18,20 | International search | [X]US2007197712 (FUJIWARA KENICHI [JP]); | [X]EP0688819 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]US5929147 (PIERICK DAVID E [US], et al); | [X]US5811494 (WHETTEN ALAN R [US], et al); | [X]US2008200615 (NIEMARK GODFRIED JOHANNES FRAN [NL], et al); | [A]EP1211289 (BOREALIS GMBH [AT]); | [A]US2005098927 (ISEKI YUKI [JP], et al) | Examination | US2006211819 | WO2006101926 | WO2006102155 | US2009105374 | by applicant | WO2006101966 | WO2006102155 | WO2006101999 | WO2006101928 | WO2006101924 | - "Extrusion, The Definitive Processing Guide and Handbook''; ''Handbook of Molded Part Shrinkage and Warpage''; ''Specialized Molding Techniques''; ''Rotational Molding Technology", Handbook of Mold, Tool and Die Repair Welding, PLASTICS DESIGN LIBRARY | Opposition | WO2010135244 | WO2009059788 | - "europaische norm", europaische norm EN 1186-1, (20020400), pages 1 - 70, XP055591236 | - "High-density polyethylene", Wikipedia, (20190312), XP055590952 |