EP2519430 - SOLENOID VALVE AND DRIVER ASSISTANCE DEVICE COMPRISING SAID TYPE OF SOLENOID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARL, Andreas Pauly Str. 12 71726 Benningen/Neckar / DE | 02 /
STEINGASS, Stephan Neue Str. 9 55237 Bornheim / DE | 03 /
VIER, Elmar Kuehaecker 11 71691 Freiberg A. N. / DE | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 10778968.7 | 04.11.2010 | WO2010EP66793 | Priority number, date | DE20091055365 | 29.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009055365 | [2012/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079988 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519430 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, F16K31/06, H01F7/121 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
B60T8/3615 (EP,US);
F16K31/06 (EP,US);
H01F7/127 (EP,US);
H01F2007/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | MAGNETVENTIL SOWIE FAHRERASSISTENZEINRICHTUNG MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN MAGNETVENTIL | [2012/45] | English: | SOLENOID VALVE AND DRIVER ASSISTANCE DEVICE COMPRISING SAID TYPE OF SOLENOID VALVE | [2012/45] | French: | ÉLECTROVANNE ET DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE COMPORTANT UNE TELLE ÉLECTROVANNE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 12.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS58124910 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]DE10117610 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraph [0011]; figure 11 * [I] 10; | [XYI]DE102004030428 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026]; figure 3; claims 2,5 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * [Y] 8 [I] 10; | [YA]WO2006056509 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * page 8, line 9 - line 15; claim 8 * [A] 1,6,9,10; | [XI]WO2008151867 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * [I] 10; | [XP]WO2010090606 (OMEGA AIR D O O [SI], et al) [XP] 1-7,9* figures 4,6-9 * |