EP2510245 - SELF EXPANDING FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRKWOOD, Brad L 17517 Southeast 302nd Street Kent, Washington 98042 / US | 02 /
FIRTH, Lee C 14816 Southeast Jones Place Renton, Washington 98058 / US | 03 /
WIDDLE, Richard D 11126 318th Place Northeast Carnation, Washington 98014 / US | 04 /
CROW, Wesley B 1814 129th Place Southeast Bellevue, Washington 98005-3940 / US | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/42] | Witte, Weller & Partner Phoenixbau Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10779164.2 | 05.11.2010 | WO2010US55683 | Priority number, date | US20090632604 | 07.12.2009 Original published format: US 632604 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011071621 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510245 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2510245 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16B1/00 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
F16B3/00 (EP,US);
F16B1/00 (BR);
F16B13/04 (BR,US);
F16B2200/77 (EP,BR,US);
Y10T29/49865 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49954 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTEXPANDIERBARER VERSCHLUSS | [2012/42] | English: | SELF EXPANDING FASTENER | [2012/42] | French: | ORGANE DE FIXATION À AUTO-EXPANSION | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 04.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2010 | AL | 17.06.2015 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | IE | 05.11.2015 | LU | 05.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 05.11.2010 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 05.11.2010 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 05.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5120175 (ARBEGAST WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-24* column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-3,4 *; | [X]DE102005053987 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-24 * the whole document * |