EP2635980 - DISTRIBUTED DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTOLOMÉ RODRIGO, Maria Cruz Avda. de la Albufera 220.6o A E-28038 Madrid / ES | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10779514.8 | 08.11.2010 | WO2010EP67063 | Priority number, date | US20100386660P | 27.09.2010 Original published format: US 386660 P | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012041404 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635980 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/2471 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE DATENBANK | [2013/37] | English: | DISTRIBUTED DATABASE | [2013/37] | French: | BASE DE DONNÉES DISTRIBUÉE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5432926 (CITRON ANDREW P [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 36 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 61 * * column 6, line 32 - column 8, line 12 ** column 11, line 54 - column 11, line 63 *; | [XI]US2009070337 (ROMEM YANIV [IL], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0126] * [I] 2-12,15-35; | [A] - SKEEN D ET AL, "A FORMAL MODEL OF CRASH RECOVERY IN A DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19830501), vol. SE-09, no. 3, ISSN 0098-5589, pages 219 - 228, XP000743876 [A] 1-35 * page 219, column r, line 3 - page 220, column l, line 14 * * page 221, column l, line 22 - page 221, column l, line 43 * | Examination | WO2008005629 | US2006212935 |