EP2498838 - ATTACHMENT SYSTEM, DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thoratec Corporation 6101 Stoneridge Drive Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHENBACH, Steven H. 3620 Florian Street Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 02 /
HOARAU, Carine 3164 Rohrer Drive Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, John Duc 92 Brevensville Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 04 /
COSTA, Ruth Eleanor 108 Dalma Drive Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 05 /
BADIA, James 1864 Maddux Drive Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 06 /
HANNULA, Donald Lee 1450 Andrews Street San Luis Obispo, CA 93401 / US | 07 /
MILLER, Andrew Ross 11 W Wedgewood Glen The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [2015/45] |
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
REICHENBACH, Steven, H. 3620 Florian Street Pleasanton California 94588 / US | ||
02 /
HOARAU, Carine 3164 Rohrer Drive Lafayette California 94549 / US | |||
03 /
NGUYEN, John Duc 92 Brevensville Drive San Ramon California 94583 / US | |||
04 /
COSTA, Ruth Eleanor 108 Dalma Drive Mountain View CA 94041 / US | |||
05 /
BADIA, James 1864 Maddux Drive Redwood City California 94061 / US | |||
06 /
HANNULA, Donald Lee 1450 Andrews Street San Luis Obispo California 93401 / US | |||
07 /
MILLER, Andrew Ross 11 W Wedgewood Glen The Woodlands Texas 77381 / US | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2012/38] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 10779657.5 | 15.11.2010 | [2015/45] | WO2010US56751 | Priority number, date | US20090590864 | 15.11.2009 Original published format: US 590864 | US20090590863 | 15.11.2009 Original published format: US 590863 | US20100945890 | 14.11.2010 Original published format: US 945890 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011060386 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2498838 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498838 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
A61M60/232 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/237 (EP,US);
A61M60/863 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3425 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2012/38] | English: | ATTACHMENT SYSTEM, DEVICE AND METHOD | [2012/38] | French: | SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 11.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2010 | AL | 04.11.2015 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | RS | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | IE | 15.11.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | NO | 04.02.2016 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 04.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002045846 (KAPLON RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,67,69,71,100,117,134,136,137,140,141,143-145,147,150 * paragraphs [0031] - [0056] * * figures 1-7 * [I] 68,72-87,118-133,135,138,139,142,146,148,149; | [A]WO03001980 (MEDQUEST PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,67,75,83-87,117-123,134,140,141,150 * page 18, line 3 - page 23, line 20 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2003130668 (NIEMAN TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [A] 76-82,135,142 * paragraph [0115] * * figure 8 *; | [X]WO2006019755 (THORATEC CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,100 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 14 * * page 11, lines 3-23 * * page 13, lines 6-14 * * figures 1-5, 9 *; | [X]US2006074484 (HUBER CHRISTOPH H [CH]) [X] 67 * paragraphs [0080] - [0081] * * figure 6 *; | [XI]US2006167333 (MOORE DANIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,100 * paragraphs [0034] - [0042] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0062] * * figure 1 * [I] 8; | [XY]WO2007038109 (ABIOMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11,100 * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 20 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 16 * * figures 13, 17a, b * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]US2007197856 (GELLMAN BARRY N [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0132] - [0134] * * figure 7 *; | [XI]WO2009100198 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 67,69-71 * page 7, line 5 - page 9, line 3 * * figures 2a-c, 4 * [I] 1-4,9,10; | [A]US2009204206 (PARQUET JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [A] 76-82,135,142 * paragraphs [0028] - [0042] ** figures 1-6 * | Examination | US6083207 |