EP2501885 - DRIVE UNIT FOR A SLIDING WING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/39] | DRIVE UNIT FOR A DISPLACEABLE SLIDE WING | ||
[2015/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co. KG Industriezentrum 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IHNOFELD, Werner Berliner Straße 16 33813 Oerlinghausen / DE | 02 /
NOLTE, Frank Bussardweg 15 49086 Osnabrück / DE | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 10779754.0 | 10.11.2010 | [2016/15] | WO2010EP67198 | Priority number, date | DE20092015621U | 18.11.2009 Original published format: DE 202009015621 U | DE20092015640U | 24.11.2009 Original published format: DE 202009015640 U | [2012/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011061103 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2501885 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2501885 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/635, E05F15/603 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
E05F15/603 (EP);
E05F15/641 (EP,US);
E05F15/635 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/674 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/716 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/726 (EP);
E05Y2400/614 (EP);
E05Y2400/656 (EP);
E05Y2400/658 (EP);
E05Y2400/66 (EP);
E05Y2600/41 (EP);
E05Y2600/46 (EP);
E05Y2800/205 (EP);
E05Y2800/23 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | E05F15/14, E05F15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für einen verfahrbaren Schiebeflügel | [2012/39] | English: | DRIVE UNIT FOR A SLIDING WING | [2015/45] | French: | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR OUVRANT COULISSANT | [2015/45] |
Former [2012/39] | DRIVE UNIT FOR A DISPLACEABLE SLIDE WING | ||
Former [2012/39] | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN VANTAIL COULISSANT | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2010 | AL | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | MT | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | AT | 10.11.2016 | GB | 10.11.2016 | IE | 10.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.11.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.11.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.11.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.11.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.11.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
AT | 10.11.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
GB | 10.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 10.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3205675 (BERNER KURT) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 36 - column 3 * * figure - *; | [Y]GB2227280 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]) [Y] 2 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * figure - *; | [Y]DE9320683U (HOLZAEPFEL CHRISTIAN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 20 * page 8, paragraph 2 ** figure - *; | [XY]DE102007030081 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * figure - * [Y] 2,4,20 |