EP2437281 - METHOD FOR PREPARING AN SOS SUBSTRATE HAVING LOW SURFACE DEFECT DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/14] | SOS SUBSTRATE HAVING LOW SURFACE DEFECT DENSITY | ||
[2013/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIYAMA, Shoji c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Atsuo c/o SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 6-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 03 /
TOBISAKA, Yuji c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0195 / JP | 04 /
KAWAI, Makoto c/o Advanced Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0195 / JP | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 10780542.6 | 25.05.2010 | WO2010JP58824 | Priority number, date | JP20090130969 | 29.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009130969 | [2012/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010137587 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437281 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2437281 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L21/265, H01L27/12, H01L21/762 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
H01L21/265 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/26506 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/2658 (EP,US);
H01L21/268 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/76254 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/86 (KR);
H01L27/1203 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | H01L21/02, H01L21/265, H01L27/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOS-SUBSTRAT MIT GERINGER OBERFLÄCHENDEFEKTDICHTE | [2013/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING AN SOS SUBSTRATE HAVING LOW SURFACE DEFECT DENSITY | [2013/43] | French: | METHODE POUR PREPARER UN SUBSTRAT SILICIUM SUR SAPHIRE (SOS) À FAIBLE DENSITÉ DE DÉFAUTS DE SURFACE | [2014/04] |
Former [2012/14] | SOS-SUBSTRAT MIT GERINGER OBERFLÄCHENDEFEKTDICHTE | ||
Former [2012/14] | SOS SUBSTRATE HAVING LOW SURFACE DEFECT DENSITY | ||
Former [2012/14] | SUBSTRAT SILICIUM SUR SAPHIR (SOS) À FAIBLE DENSITÉ DE DÉFAUTS DE SURFACE | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2011 | Translation filed | 27.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 11.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2010 | AL | 18.06.2014 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.05.2010 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 25.05.2010 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008105101 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [XP]EP2128891 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [XP] 1-5 * paragraphs [0059] - [0078]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US7122865 (HOELZL ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 31-46; claims 1,2 * [I] 2-5; | [XAI]EP1986218 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 6-11,15-18 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1a-1h * [A] 1-5 [I] 12-14 | International search | [X]JP2007227415 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2005005711 (SILTRONIC AG) | by applicant | - YOSHII ET AL., JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (1982), vol. 21, no. 21-1, pages 175 - 179 | - Science of SOI, REALIZE SCIENCE&ENGINEERING CENTER CO., LTD. |