EP2435565 - SONICATION CARTRIDGE FOR NUCLEIC ACID EXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SADRI, Amir M. 2402-18 Harrison Garden Toronto, Ontario M2N 7J7 / CA | 02 /
KIRCANSKI, Nenad 20 Fleetwell Court Toronto, Ontario M2R 1L3 / CA | 03 /
KIRCANSKI, Manja 20 Fleetwell Court Toronto, Ontario M2R 1L3 / CA | 04 /
NIKOLIC, Neven 206-1951 Rathburn Road East Mississauga, Ontario L4W 2N9 / CA | 05 /
TIMOTIJEVIC, Milija 1110-109 Front Street East Toronto, Ontario M5S 4P7 / CA | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10781266.1 | 28.05.2010 | WO2010US36546 | Priority number, date | US20090182183P | 29.05.2009 Original published format: US 182183 P | US20100788777 | 27.05.2010 Original published format: US 788777 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010138800 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435565 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N13/00 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C12N13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLPATRONE ZUR NUKLEINSÄUREEXTRAKTION | [2012/14] | English: | SONICATION CARTRIDGE FOR NUCLEIC ACID EXTRACTION | [2012/14] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE SONICATION POUR EXTRACTION D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 21.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1693454 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 | International search | [Y]US2006030038 (TAYLOR MICHAEL T [US], et al); | [Y]US2007248958 (JOVANOVICH STEVAN B [US], et al) |