EP2435326 - IMPROVED BARREL CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DBGlobal LLC P.O. Box 396 Ruffin, NC 27326 / US | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENEALY, David P.O. Box 396 Ruffin, NC 27326 / US | 02 /
CANNON, John, R. 1133 Shady Lane South Boston, VA 24592 / US | 03 /
RUBINO, James, E. 3841 Touchberry Lane Hickory, NC 28601 / US | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Ashton, Gareth Mark Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Ashton, Gareth Mark Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10781374.3 | 29.05.2010 | WO2010US36777 | Priority number, date | US20090182317P | 29.05.2009 Original published format: US 182317 P | US20100788991 | 27.05.2010 Original published format: US 788991 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010138954 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435326 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/00, B65D6/14, B65D6/34, B27H3/02 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
B65D9/04 (EP,US);
B65D25/20 (US);
B27H3/02 (US);
B65D88/08 (US);
B65D9/30 (EP,US);
B65D9/34 (EP,US);
B65D45/32 (US);
B65D9/38 (US);
Y02A40/90 (EP,US);
Y10T292/205 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | B65D8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE TROMMELKONSTRUKTION | [2012/14] | English: | IMPROVED BARREL CONSTRUCTION | [2012/14] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE FÛT AMÉLIORÉE | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 27.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2050461 (PERRY THOMAS D) [Y] 1-8,12-15,17 * page 1, column 2, line 41 - page 3, column 2, line 11; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2289245 (DANT GEORGE W) [Y] 7,8 * page 1, column 2, line 19 - page 2, column 1, line 4; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]FR1078850 (BOSCHETTI V) [Y] 1,3,6,13,14,17 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 7 - column 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US3462038 (MORRIS GEORGE RICHARD) [Y] 1-8,12-15,17 * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 45; figures 1-13 *; | [YA]US7240609 (BERECZ IMRE [US]) [Y] 12,15 * column 5, lines 10-64; figures 1-12 * [A] 9; | [Y]FR2907703 (LALANNE PATRICK [FR]) [Y] 1,3,6,13,14,17* page 4, lines 16-28; figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US209384 (CUTTS); | [Y]US2267888 (ARNOLD CHARLES B); | [Y]US2289245 (DANT GEORGE W); | [X]GB2138770 (REECE JOHN, et al); | [Y]US4484688 (SMITH ROBERT H [US]); | [X]US6898834 (WARREN PETER [AU]); | [Y]US7240609 (BERECZ IMRE [US]) |