EP2499156 - PENTOSE TRANSPORTERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Utrecht Holding B.V. Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | For all designated states Vereniging Voor Christelijk Hoger Onderwijs, Weten De Boelelaan 1105 1081 HV Amsterdam / NL | For all designated states Stichting voor de Technische Wetenschappen Van Vollenhovenlaan 661 3527 JP Utrecht / NL | For all designated states Universiteit Leiden Rapenburg 2311 EZ Leiden / NL | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANKUYK, Patricia, Ann Seychellen 142 NL-3524 JB Utrecht / NL | 02 /
DE VRIES, Ronald, Peter Seychellen 142 NL-3524 JB Utrecht / NL | 03 /
VISSER, Jacob Hinkeloordseweg 5 NL-6703 CK Wageningen / NL | 04 /
RAM, Arthur, Franciscus, Johannes Willem de Rijkelaan 40 NL-2181 TB Hillegom / NL | 05 /
VAN DEN HONDEL, Cornelis Antonius Maria Jacobus J. Waterlelie 124 NL-2804 PZ Gouda / NL | 06 /
BATTAGLIA, Evy Chrysantstraat 38 NL-3551TT Utrecht / NL | 07 /
VIVAS DUARTE, Diana, Alexandra Fregatstraat 60 NL-3534 RG Utrecht / NL | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10782727.1 | 12.11.2010 | WO2010NL50755 | Priority number, date | WO2009NL50683 | 12.11.2009 Original published format: PCT/NL2009/050683 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011059329 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2499156 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/38 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/38 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | PENTOSETRANSPOERTER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2012/38] | English: | PENTOSE TRANSPORTERS AND USES THEREOF | [2012/38] | French: | TRANSPORTEURS DE PENTOSE ET SES UTILISATION | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2009008756 (UNIV NOVA DE LISBOA [PT], et al) [I] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I]DE102006060381 (UNIV JW GOETHE FRANKFURT MAIN [DE]) [I] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I] - "Aspergillus niger contig An06c0020, complete genome.", EMBL, (20070128), Database accession no. AM270108, URL: EBI, XP002584331 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | [I] - "SubName: Full=Induction: S. cerevisiae HXT genes are induced by glucose;", UniProt, (20070306), Database accession no. A2QLB0, URL: EBI, XP002584332 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - "CATY7038.fwd CATY Aspergillus niger fungal filamentous biomass grown under different carbon sources Aspergillus niger cDNA clone CATY7038 5', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20071120), Database accession no. EY249413, URL: EBI, XP002584333 [A] 1-19 * compound . * | [A] - JEFFRIES T W ET AL, "Metabolic engineering for improved fermentation of pentoses by yeasts", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20040101), vol. 63, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 495 - 509, XP002999147 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - RICHARD P ET AL, "Production of ethanol from L-arabinose by Saccharomyces cerevisiae containing a fungal L-arabinose pathway", FEMS YEAST RESEARCH, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, NL, (20030101), vol. 3, ISSN 1567-1356, pages 185 - 189, XP002999146 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - PEL HERMAN J ET AL, "Genome sequencing and analysis of the versatile cell factory Aspergillus niger CBS 513.88", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NBT1282, (20070201), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 221 - 231, XP002458027 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1282 | by applicant | WO2008080505 | WO2009008756 | WO2007018442 | - SIQUEIRA ET AL., BIORESOUR. TECHNOL., (2008), vol. 99, no. 17, pages 8156 - 63 | - ALRIKSSON ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2009), vol. 75, no. 8, pages 2366 - 74 | - PEIXOTO-NOGUEIRA SDE C ET AL., J. IND. MICROBIOL. TECHNOL, (2009), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 149 - 55 | - HE ET AL., "disclose ergosterol production from molasses by genetically modified Saccharomyces cerevisiae", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 75, pages 55 - 60 | - GHAZI ET AL., "describe beet syrup and molasses as low-cost feedstock for the enzymatic production of fructo- oligosaccharides", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2006), vol. 54, no. 8, pages 2964 - 8 | - LEANDRO ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2006), vol. 395, pages 543 - 549 | - BENGTSSON ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOFUELS, (2009), vol. 5, no. 2, page 9 | - KRAHULEC ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. J., (2009), vol. 4, pages 684 - 694 | - RUNDQUIST ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 82, pages 123 - 130 | - WALSH ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1994), vol. 176, pages 953 - 958 | - Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY | - DAVID LANE, IMPERIAL CANCER RESEARCH FUND LABORATORIES | - VRIES, R.P.; K. BURGERS; P.J.I. VAN DE VONDERVOORT; J.C. FRISVAD; R.A. SAMSON; J. VISSER, "A new black Aspergillus species, A. vadensis, is a promising host for homologous and heterologous protein production", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 70, pages 3954 - 3959 | - VANKUYK ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2004), vol. 379, pages 375 - 383 | - DE GROOT ET AL., FOOD TECHNOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 45, pages 134 - 138 | - PEL ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 25, pages 221 - 231 | - BAKER SE, MED. MYCOL., (2006), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 517 - 21 | - SERRANO, R., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1977), vol. 80, pages 97 - 102 | - SANTOS, E, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS, (1982), vol. 216, pages 625 - 660 |