EP2502267 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING STRAIN MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Haining 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street GB-London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10782788.3 | 19.11.2010 | WO2010US57514 | Priority number, date | US20090621736 | 19.11.2009 Original published format: US 621736 | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011063292 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2502267 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8246 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
H01L21/823807 (EP,US);
H10B20/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/088 (US);
H01L21/02107 (US);
H01L21/486 (US);
H01L29/78 (EP,US);
H01L29/7843 (EP,US);
H03K17/687 (US);
H10B20/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT MIT DEHNUNGSMATERIAL | [2012/39] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING STRAIN MATERIAL | [2012/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS COMPORTANT DU MATÉRIAU DE DÉFORMATION | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 23.08.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 10.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008079097 (INOKUMA HIDEKI [JP]); | [XI]US2008296693 (RICHTER RALF [DE], et al); | [IA]US2009001526 (FEUSTEL FRANK [DE], et al); | [A]US2009081563 (WANG HELEN [US], et al); | Examination | US2005035470 |