EP2440790 - IMPROVED SPLINE STRESS DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P. O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Donn, J. 29320 E. 36th St. Broken Arrow OK 74014 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Brown, L. 6797 E. 25th Pl. Tulsa OK 74129 / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10783940.9 | 01.06.2010 | WO2010US36934 | Priority number, date | US20090475685 | 01.06.2009 Original published format: US 475685 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010141490 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2440790 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/20, F04D29/044, E21B17/02, F04B17/00, F16D1/10 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
F16D1/101 (EP,US);
F16D1/02 (EP);
F16D3/10 (EP);
F16D2001/103 (EP,US);
Y10T403/1624 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/16] | F04D29/20, F04D29/044, E21B17/02, F04B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE KEILBELASTUNGSVERTEILUNG | [2012/16] | English: | IMPROVED SPLINE STRESS DISTRIBUTION | [2012/16] | French: | RÉPARTITION AMÉLIORÉE DES CONTRAINTES DE CANNELURES | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3360961 (ADOLF STEINER) [X] 1-8,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4115022 (ORAIN MICHEL A) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XY]FR2562969 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1-8,10,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 15; | [XA]FR2600133 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [A] 15; | [XY]US5533825 (STONE TIMOTHY D [US]) [X] 1-4,13 * column 2, line 2 - line 14; figure 6 * [Y] 12; | [XY]US5660494 (SCHWAERZLER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 12,15; | [Y]JP2002174197 (KAWAMOTO PUMP MFG) [Y] 12,15* abstract *; | [X]US2002110415 (DOWLING WILLIAM EDMUNDS [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]KR100232069B (TEXTRON INC [US]); | [Y]JP2002174197 (KAWAMOTO PUMP MFG); | [E]KR20100065655 (HALLA CLIMATE CONTROL CORP [KR]) |