EP2513589 - FIBER-REINFORCED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANZ, Marcus Schwalbenweg 10 86830 Schwabmünchen / DE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 10784732.9 | 10.11.2010 | WO2010EP67211 | Priority number, date | DE20091054910 | 17.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009054910 | [2012/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011082866 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513589 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28F21/04 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
F28F21/04 (EP,KR,US);
F28F21/00 (KR);
F28F2225/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | FASERARMIERTER KÖRPER | [2012/43] | English: | FIBER-REINFORCED BODY | [2012/43] | French: | CORPS ARMÉ PAR DES FIBRES | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 17.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5765596 (LAHAYE PAUL G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,14,15 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 47; example II *; | [I]US4474233 (SWOZIL ADOLF [DE]) [I] 1-4,6-13,15 * column 4, line 3 - line 5 *; | [I]DE3415238 (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-4,6-13,15 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 3; figure 3 *; | [A]US2006039524 (FEINROTH HERBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037]; figure - *; | [A]DE3319296 (LORRAINE CARBONE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3,4; example 2 * | by applicant | DE19714423 |