EP2504290 - METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING AEROGEL COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/40] | AEROGEL COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEM | ||
[2017/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cabot Corporation 2 Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston MA 02210-2019 / US | [2018/17] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Cabot Corporation 2 Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, MA 02210-2019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOSHI, Dhaval Arun 51 Fifer Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Thomas, Michael 297 Flagler Drive Holden, MA 01520 / US | 03 /
CHASE, Joshua Harby 59 Washington Street 2 Medford, MA 02155 / US | 04 /
NORWOOD, Catherine Meryl 77 Newbury Street Apt. 2R Somerville, MA 02144 / US | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/17] |
Former [2012/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10784926.7 | 22.11.2010 | [2018/17] | WO2010US57576 | Priority number, date | US20090264352P | 25.11.2009 Original published format: US 264352 P | US20100296183P | 19.01.2010 Original published format: US 296183 P | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011066209 | Date: | 03.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2504290 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2504290 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B14/06 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
C04B14/064 (EP,KR,US);
C04B14/302 (EP,KR,US);
C04B28/00 (CN);
E04B1/88 (US);
B28B3/02 (US);
C04B28/02 (EP,KR,US);
C04B28/10 (CN);
C04B28/14 (CN);
C04B38/00 (US);
C04B2111/00465 (KR);
C04B2111/28 (EP,US);
C04B2111/40 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2111/52 (EP,US);
C04B2111/70 (KR);
Y02A30/24 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/00, C04B14/064, C04B14/302, C04B14/38 (CN);
C04B28/02, C04B14/064, C04B20/0048 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B14/302, C04B20/0048 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AEROGELVERBUNDSTOFFEN | [2017/47] | English: | METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING AEROGEL COMPOSITES | [2017/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSITES À BASE D'AÉROGEL | [2017/47] |
Former [2012/40] | AEROGELVERBUNDSTOFFE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2012/40] | AEROGEL COMPOSITES AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEM | ||
Former [2012/40] | COMPOSITES À BASE D'AÉROGEL ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 10.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2010 | AL | 25.04.2018 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | IE | 22.11.2018 | LU | 22.11.2018 | MT | 22.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.11.2010 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
MK | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.11.2010 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9420274 (KHASHOGGI E IND [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * examples 11,12,27,28; claims 1-97 *; | [X]DE4441567 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-58* the whole document *; | [X]DE19533564 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-58 * page 4, line 18 - line 26 * * claims 1-17 * * example 2 *; | [X]US5631097 (ANDERSEN PER J [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * examples 11,12,27,28; claims 1-111 *; | [X]US5641584 (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * examples 11,12,27,28; claims 1-107 * | by applicant | US5786059 | US5789075 | US5866027 | US5904763 | US6143400 | US2001034375 | US6709600 | US2005046086 | US6887563 | US2005167891 | US2006272727 | WO2007047970 | WO2009134992 | US20100264352 | US20060515806 | US20100296183 |