EP2514274 - DYNAMIC AMBIENCE LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TP Vision Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COEZIJN, Etienne, René, Eveline c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GALEAZZI, Guido c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KWISTHOUT, Cornelis, Wilhelmus c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/43] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10785538.9 | 11.11.2010 | WO2010IB55119 | Priority number, date | EP20090179300 | 15.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09179300 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011073811 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514274 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H04N9/73 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04N5/57 (EP,KR,US);
G09G5/00 (KR);
H04N21/4318 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/64 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/66 (EP,KR,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES UMGEBUNGSBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/43] | English: | DYNAMIC AMBIENCE LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2012/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'AMBIANCE DYNAMIQUE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 10.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006003624 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 12, line 16 ** figures 1-53 *; | [A]WO2007036890 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 7 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2008050281 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 20 * * page 13, line 22 - line 30 * * figures 1-8 *; | [XI]WO2008078236 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,7-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 17 * * page 6, line 1 - line 14 * * page 7, line 13 - line 25 * * page 9, line 5 - page 11, line 16 * * page 13, line 19 - page 15, line 13 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2-6 |