EP2440705 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PAPER AND PRODUCTS OBTAINED BY THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Eteläesplanadi 2 00130 Helsinki / FI | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Eteläesplanadi 2 00130 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P. O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENTZE, Hans-Peter Aallokko 3 A 75 02320 Espoo / FI | 02 /
SIEVÄNEN, Jenni Sampsantie 46 C 18 00610 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
KETTLE, John Mannerheimintie 91A 00270 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
KULACHENKO, Artem Flygvillesllingen 20, tr, 1 18367 Täby / FI | 05 /
KORPELA, Antti Teljäntie 9 B 24 00350 Helsinki / FI | 06 /
KETOJA, Jukka Rintamäentanhua 5 A 4 02770 Espoo / FI | 07 /
HELLÉN, Erkki Solkikuja 10 A 1 01600 Vantaa / FI | 08 /
HJELT, Tuomo Hämeentie 50 B 33 00500 Helsinki / FI | 09 /
HILTUNEN, Jaakko Elinanpolku 3 B 02700 Kauniainen / FI | 10 /
TURUNEN, Eila Kokkohangantie 6 A 1 02340 Espoo / FI | 11 /
SNECK, Asko Kiiltomadonkuja 10 02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/45] | Luoto, Kristian Reinhold, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/16] | Arvela, Sakari Mikael Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10785795.5 | 07.06.2010 | WO2010FI50467 | Priority number, date | FI20090005634 | 08.06.2009 Original published format: FI 20095634 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010142846 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2440705 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D21H11/18, D21H27/00, D21D1/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
D21F11/00 (EP,FI,US);
D21H11/18 (EP,FI,US);
D21H11/20 (EP,US);
D21H15/02 (EP,US);
D21H17/63 (EP,US);
D21H27/00 (FI);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG UND IN DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE | [2012/16] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING PAPER AND PRODUCTS OBTAINED BY THE METHOD | [2012/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER ET PRODUITS OBTENUS AVEC LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH10248872 ; | [X]JPH11106403 ; | [X]US2005067730 (YANO HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [XP]US2010065236 (HENRIKSSON MARIELLE [SE], et al); | [XP]JP2010007010 ; | [A]EP1036799 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]US2005051487 (KOSLOW EVAN E [US]); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 48, Database accession no. 1998-561001, XP003026983 & JPH10248872 A 19980922 (KINOSEI MOKUSHITSU SHINSOZAI GIJUTSU KEN ET AL) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 26, Database accession no. 1999-308105, XP003026984 & JPH11106403 A 19990420 (TOKUSHU SEISHI KK) | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 06, Database accession no. 2010-A36810, XP003026935 & JP2010007010 A 20100114 (HITACHI LTD ET AL) | [A] - HENRIKSSON M. ET AL, "Cellulose nanopaper structures of high toughness", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 1579 - 1585, XP003026919 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BM800038N | [A] - "Additives influencing the quality and printability of the paper surface", HOLIK H., Part of the book: Handbook of Paper and Board, WEINHEIM, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH & CO., (2006), pages 121 - 127, ISBN 9783527309979, XP003026987 | by applicant | US2007207692 | WO2007091942 | JP2004204380 | US7381294 | - HENRIKSSON ET AL., CELLULOSE NANOPAPER STRUCTURES OF HIGH TOUGHNESS, BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 1579 - 1585 |