EP2441885 - MODIFIED CELLULOSE FIBER AND CELLULOSE COMPOSITE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/16] | MODIFIED CELLULOSE FIBER AND CELLULOSE COMPLEX COMPRISING SAME | ||
[2013/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKAI, Hideko c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Group Science and Technology Research Center Inc. 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10786253.4 | 11.06.2010 | WO2010JP59976 | Priority number, date | JP20090140697 | 12.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009140697 | [2012/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010143722 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441885 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2441885 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/152, C08B11/16, C08K7/02, C08L1/08, D01F2/00, D06M13/184, D06M13/395, D06M101/08, D21H11/20 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
C08J5/045 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08B11/16 (EP,US);
C08J5/005 (EP,US);
C08L1/08 (EP,US);
D06M13/11 (EP,US);
D06M13/152 (EP,US);
D06M13/1845 (EP,US);
D06M13/395 (EP,US);
D06M13/507 (EP,US);
D21H11/16 (EP,US);
D21H11/20 (EP,US);
C08J2301/08 (EP,US);
C08J2351/02 (EP,US);
D06M2101/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/16] | D06M13/152, C08B11/16, C08K7/02, C08L1/08, D01F2/00, D06M13/184, D06M13/395, D06M101/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE ZELLULOSEFASER UND ZELLULOSEVERBUNDSTOFF DAVON | [2013/45] | English: | MODIFIED CELLULOSE FIBER AND CELLULOSE COMPOSITE THEREOF | [2013/45] | French: | FIBRE DE CELLULOSE MODIFIÉE ET COMPOSITE DE CELLULOSE DE CELLE-CI | [2013/45] |
Former [2012/16] | MODIFIZIERTE ZELLULOSEFASER UND ZELLULOSEKOMPLEX DAMIT | ||
Former [2012/16] | MODIFIED CELLULOSE FIBER AND CELLULOSE COMPLEX COMPRISING SAME | ||
Former [2012/16] | FIBRE DE CELLULOSE MODIFIÉE ET COMPLEXE DE CELLULOSE LA COMPRENANT | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2011 | Translation filed | 04.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2010 | AL | 27.11.2013 | AT | 27.11.2013 | BE | 27.11.2013 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | IT | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | SM | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | NO | 27.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | GB | 11.06.2014 | IE | 11.06.2014 | LU | 11.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.06.2010 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.06.2010 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.06.2010 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
GB | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004088035 (M REAL OYJ [FI], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-16 *; | [A]US3443879 (ARTHUR JETT C JR, et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-2 * | International search | [A]JP2008248441 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]JP2008174869 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH0632801 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [A]JP2008024788 (UNIV KYOTO, et al); | [XP]JP2009299043 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [XP]JP2009167397 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) | by applicant | JP2007051266 | JP2008274461 | JP2009140697 | - CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (2008), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 875 - 879 | - Serur5su No Jiten, ASAKURA PUBLISHING CO., LTD., pages 81 - 86,93-99 |