EP2509712 - METHOD FOR REGENERATING A SUPPORTED HYDROGENATION CATALYST CONTAINING RUTHENIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIRK, Daniela Lindenweg 18 67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
SCHAPPERT, Christoph Adlerstr.1 67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 03 /
STABEL, Uwe Pappelstr. 31 67166 Otterstadt / DE | 04 /
GAFFRON, Eberhardt Erste Neugasse 38 68623 Lampertheim / DE | 05 /
PROCHAZKA, Roman Meerwiesenstr. 54 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 10787119.6 | 06.12.2010 | WO2010EP68911 | Priority number, date | EP20090178939 | 11.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09178939 | [2012/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011069933 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2509712 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/96, B01J38/06, B01J35/10, B01J35/00, C07C5/10, C07C13/18 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
B01J23/96 (EP,US);
B01J38/06 (EP,US);
C07C5/10 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,US);
B01J35/397 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/651 (EP,US);
B01J35/653 (EP,US);
B01J35/657 (EP,US);
B01J35/69 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2523/46 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C5/10, C07C13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERIERUNG EINES RUTHENIUM-HALTIGEN GETRÄGERTEN HYDRIERKATALYSATORS | [2012/42] | English: | METHOD FOR REGENERATING A SUPPORTED HYDROGENATION CATALYST CONTAINING RUTHENIUM | [2012/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGÉNÉRATION D'UN CATALYSEUR D'HYDROGÉNATION SUPPORTÉ À TENEUR EN RUTHÉNIUM | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3753926 (HAYES J); | [XY]GB1452087 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [X]US5495055 (RUETER MICHAEL A [US]); | [Y]DE102005029200 (BASF AG [DE]) | by applicant | US2757128 | US3245919 | US3851004 | EP0243894 | WO9304774 | DE19634880 | EP0814098 | WO0063142 | EP1169285 | WO02100537 | WO2006136541 | DE102005029200 | WO2008015103 | WO2008015170 | JP2008238043 |